Jackman v. 20th Judicial Circuit Court Administration
Plaintiff: Keiron Keith Jackman
Defendant: 20th Judicial Circuit Court Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00828
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/10/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/26/2019. (jmc)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/10/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/26/2019. (jmc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages.Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/19/2019. (drn)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to 20th Judicial Circuit Court Administration. (RMT)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 20th Judicial Circuit Court Administration with Jury Demand Filing fee $400, receipt number FtM014423 filed by Keiron Keith Jackman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackman v. 20th Judicial Circuit Court Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 20th Judicial Circuit Court Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keiron Keith Jackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?