Da Silva et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marcos Da Silva and William Comtois
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Albertelli Law, LLP and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00893
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Albertelli Law, LLP, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Marcos Da Silva, William Comtois. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by William Comtois, Marcos Da Silva.(drn)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Amended Complaint [8-1] as a separate document. The Amended Complaint now becomes the operative complaint in this action. See Order for further details regarding service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 2/5/2020. (brh)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by William Comtois, Marcos Da Silva. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(drn)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Re-Stating Request for Immediate Relief and Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/3/2020. (brh)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and re-stating request for immediate relief by William Comtois, Marcos Da Silva. (MLJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by William Comtois, Marcos Da Silva. Related case(s): yes. (MLJ)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/2/2020. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/19/2019. (MLJ)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/19/2019. (MLJ)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Albertelli Law, LLP, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (RMT)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albertelli Law, LLP, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. with Jury Demand Filing fee $400, receipt number FtM014282 filed by Marcos Da Silva, William Comtois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Da Silva et al v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertelli Law, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcos Da Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Comtois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?