Reilly v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: John Anthony Reilly
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00917
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 1/22/2020 as to Attorney General of the United States. U.S. Marshal form for receipt and return of service via certified mail. (MLJ)
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 1/21/2020 by John Anthony Reilly as to Commissioner of Social Security. US Marshal 285 form for receipt and return of service via certified mail, return receipt 7019 0700 0000 6530 0961. (MLJ)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MLJ)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John Anthony Reilly. Related case(s): no (Avard, Carol)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to file all pleadings in this case without requiring prepayment of fees or costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide Plaintiff with a complete set of the following forms: (a) AO 440 (or equivalent) Summons in a Civil Action form; and (b) United States Marshals Form 285. No later than 1/23/2020, Plaintiff must prepare and return the completed service documents, along with sufficient copies of the original Complaint, to the Clerk of Court for service by the United States Marshals Service. Upon receipt of appropriate instructions in proper form from the Clerk of Court, the United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process without prepayment of costs or fees. If Plaintiff does not comply timely with this Order the Undersigned will recommend to the presiding United States District Judge that this action be dismissed. M.D. Fla. R. 3.10. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/2/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/8/2015. (MLJ)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (MLJ)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/16/2020. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/2/2020. (jmc)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-917-FtM-38MRM. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (SMS)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Anthony Reilly. (Avard, Carol)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by John Anthony Reilly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit Request for Reconsideration, #4 Exhibit Statement of Good Cause for Late Filing, #5 Exhibit Notice of Reconsideration, #6 Exhibit Formal Request for Hearing, #7 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reilly v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Anthony Reilly
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Represented By: Mark V. Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?