Y. et al v. Naples Hotel Company et al.
Plaintiff: C. S. and S. Y.
Defendant: Gregory Hines, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC d/b/a Holiday Inn Express, Master Cleaners Pro Services Inc. d/b/a Sunrise Motel, Inn of Naples, LLC d/b/a Inn of Naples, The Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation d/b/a Holiday Inn Express, Naples Hotel Company d/b/a Gulfcoast Inn Naples, Uomi & Kudai, LLC d/b/a Spinnaker Inn, John Doe, as agent of Naples Hotel Company d/b/a Gulfcoast Inn Naples and/or The Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn, Radhey Inc. d/b/a Tamiami Motel, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Super 8 by Wyndham, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott, Marriott International, Inc. d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, Best Western International, Inc. d/b/a Best Western Naples Inn & Suites, Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn, Shivparvti, LLC d/b/a Sunrise Motel, Choice Hotels International, Inc. d/b/a Comfort Inn & Executive Suites, Mars Merger Sub, LLC d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Super 8 by Wyndham, Naples Garden Inn, LLC d/b/a Naples Garden Inn, Hilton Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Ramada by Wyndham Naples, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a La Quinta Inn, Park Hotels & Resorts Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn, Holistic Health Healing, Inc. d/b/a Conty's Motel, Best Western International, Inc. d/b/a Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel, Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC d/b/a Glades Motel, Keith Lewis, Choice Hotels International, Inc. d/b/a Quality Inn & Suites Golf Resort, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Ramada by Wyndham Naples, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC d/b/a Staybridge Suites, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Days Inn & Suites, Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Days Inn & Suites, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott, Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation d/b/a Staybridge Suites, Naples Park Central Hotel, LLC d/b/a Naples Park Central Hotel, Marriott International, Inc. d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, Mars Merger Sub, LLC d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, R & M REAL ESTATE COMPANY INC., d/b/a COMFORT INN & EXECUTIVE SUITES, HIE TOLLGATE BLVD LLC d/b/a HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS, NAPLES GARDEN INN, LLC, d/b/a NAPLES GARDEN INN, MASTER CLEANERS PRO SERVICES INC, d/b/a SUNRISE MOTEL, LAXMI OF NAPLES, LLC d/b/a SUPER 8 BY WYNDHAM, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC, NAPLES CFC ENTERPRISES LTD d/b/a STAYBRIDGE SUITES, NAPLES HOTEL COMPANY, d/b/a GULFCOAST INN NAPLES, CSM CORPORATION d/b/a RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT, Park Hotels & Resorts Inc., CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., d/b/a QUALITY INN & SUITES GOLF RESORT, Inn of Naples, LLC, Radhey Inc., HANUMAN OF NAPLES LLC d/b/a DAY INN, SEA SHELL MANAGEMENT, LLC, d/b/a SEA SHELL MOTEL, INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP PLC d/b/a HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP LLC d/b/a STAYBRIDGE SUITES, PARK SHORE RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. d/b/a PARKSHORE RESORTS, Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC., CSM RI NAPLES LLC d/b/a RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT, HOLISTIC HEALTH HEALING, INC., d/b/a CONTY'S MOTEL, LAPORTA FLORIDA CENTER LLC d/b/a NAPLES GARDEN INN, Naples Hotel Company, Best Western International, Inc., Naples Garden Inn, LLC, CLAYTON PLAZA, LLC, d/b/a SEA SHELL MOTEL, Naples Park Central Hotel, LLC, ROBERT VOCISANO, d/b/a QUALITY INN & SUITES GOLF RESORT, Master Cleaners Pro Services Inc., LA QUINTA PROPERTIES, INC. d/b/a LA QUINTA INN, Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., H. I. NAPLES LLC d/b/a DAYS INN, Mars Merger Sub, LLC, UOMI & KUDAI, LLC, d/b/a SPINNAKER INN, Choice Hotels International, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., SUNSTREAM HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC d/b/a PARKSHORE RESORTS, R & M REAL ESTATE CO INC, d/b/a BEST WESTERN NAPLES PLAZA HOTEL; ROBERT VOCISANO CO-TR, d/b/a BEST WESTERN NAPLES PLAZA HOTEL, SHREE SIDDHIVINAYAK HOSPITALITY, LLC d/b/a DAYS INN, LA QUINTA HOLDINGS INC. d/b/a LA QUINTA INN, JAY VARAHIMATA INVESTMENTS, LLC, d/b/a GLADES MOTEL, Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, COREPOINT LODGING, INC. and CPLG LLC d/b/a LA QUINTA INN, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC, Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., LQ FL PROPERTIES LLC, name change CPLG FL PROPERTIES LLC d/b/a LA QUINTA INN, Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT, LLC d/b/a RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT, Shivparvti, LLC, Hilton Worldwide, Inc., CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., d/b/a COMFORT INN & EXECUTIVE SUITES, WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. d/b/a DAYS INN, Holistic Health Healing, Inc., Uomi & Kudai, LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Wyndham Franchisor, LLC, INN OF NAPLES HOTEL, LLC, d/b/a INN OF NAPLES, SEASONAL INVESTMENTS, INC., d/b/a FAIRWAYS INN OF NAPLES, RIST PROPERTIES LLC d/b/a RAMADA BY WYNDHAM NAPLES, BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC., d/b/a BEST WESTERN NAPLES PLAZA HOTEL, SHIVPARVTI, LLC, d/b/a SUNRISE MOTEL and THE GULFCOAST INN OF NAPLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., d/b/a GULFCOAST INN NAPLES
Case Number: 2:2020cv00118
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed a Second Amended Complaint. (Doc. #85). Consequently, the Defendants' various motions to dismiss (Docs. #33, #37, #40, #48, #52, #53, #55, #56, #57, #58, #59, #66) are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/16/2020. (ZRN)
April 15, 2020 Filing 85 AMENDED COMPLAINT against R & M REAL ESTATE CO INC, d/b/a BEST WESTERN NAPLES PLAZA HOTEL; ROBERT VOCISANO CO-TR, d/b/a BEST WESTERN NAPLES PLAZA HOTEL, CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., d/b/a QUALITY INN & SUITES GOLF RESORT, ROBERT VOCISANO, d/b/a QUALITY INN & SUITES GOLF RESORT, R & M REAL ESTATE COMPANY INC., d/b/a COMFORT INN & EXECUTIVE SUITES, WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. d/b/a DAYS INN, HANUMAN OF NAPLES LLC d/b/a DAY INN, SHREE SIDDHIVINAYAK HOSPITALITY, LLC d/b/a DAYS INN, H. I. NAPLES LLC d/b/a DAYS INN, INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP PLC d/b/a HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC d/b/a Holiday Inn Express, HIE TOLLGATE BLVD LLC d/b/a HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS, INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP LLC d/b/a STAYBRIDGE SUITES, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC d/b/a Staybridge Suites, NAPLES CFC ENTERPRISES LTD d/b/a STAYBRIDGE SUITES, Marriott International, Inc. d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott, RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT, LLC d/b/a RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT, CSM RI NAPLES LLC d/b/a RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT, CSM CORPORATION d/b/a RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT, LA QUINTA PROPERTIES, INC. d/b/a LA QUINTA INN, LA QUINTA HOLDINGS INC. d/b/a LA QUINTA INN, COREPOINT LODGING, INC. and CPLG LLC d/b/a LA QUINTA INN, LQ FL PROPERTIES LLC, name change CPLG FL PROPERTIES LLC d/b/a LA QUINTA INN, LAXMI OF NAPLES, LLC d/b/a SUPER 8 BY WYNDHAM, WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. d/b/a SUPER 8 BY WYNDHAM, WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. d/b/a RAMADA BY WYNDHAM NAPLES, RIST PROPERTIES LLC d/b/a RAMADA BY WYNDHAM NAPLES, NAPLES GARDEN INN, LLC, d/b/a NAPLES GARDEN INN, LAPORTA FLORIDA CENTER LLC d/b/a NAPLES GARDEN INN, UOMI & KUDAI, LLC, d/b/a SPINNAKER INN, SHIVPARVTI, LLC, d/b/a SUNRISE MOTEL, MASTER CLEANERS PRO SERVICES INC, d/b/a SUNRISE MOTEL, HOLISTIC HEALTH HEALING, INC., d/b/a CONTY'S MOTEL, JAY VARAHIMATA INVESTMENTS, LLC, d/b/a GLADES MOTEL, INN OF NAPLES HOTEL, LLC, d/b/a INN OF NAPLES, SEASONAL INVESTMENTS, INC., d/b/a FAIRWAYS INN OF NAPLES, SUNSTREAM HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC d/b/a PARKSHORE RESORTS, PARK SHORE RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. d/b/a PARKSHORE RESORTS, SEA SHELL MANAGEMENT, LLC, d/b/a SEA SHELL MOTEL, CLAYTON PLAZA, LLC, d/b/a SEA SHELL MOTEL, BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC., d/b/a BEST WESTERN NAPLES PLAZA HOTEL, NAPLES HOTEL COMPANY, d/b/a GULFCOAST INN NAPLES, THE GULFCOAST INN OF NAPLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., d/b/a GULFCOAST INN NAPLES, CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., d/b/a COMFORT INN & EXECUTIVE SUITES, WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. d/b/a LA QUINTA INN with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Hanlon, Sharon)
April 10, 2020 Filing 84 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Uomi & Kudai, LLC. (Beebe, Brooke)
April 10, 2020 Filing 83 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Shivparvti, LLC. (Beebe, Brooke)
April 10, 2020 Filing 82 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Naples Park Central Hotel, LLC. (Beebe, Brooke)
April 10, 2020 Filing 81 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.. (Beebe, Brooke)
April 10, 2020 Filing 80 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Holistic Health Healing, Inc.. (Beebe, Brooke)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ENDORSED ORDER: The parties' "Motion and Agreement Regarding the Filing of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and Defendants' Responsive Pleadings" (Doc. #78) is hereby granted in part and denied in part. The Court grants Plaintiffs leave to file a second amended complaint on or before April 15, 2020; Defendants shall have fourteen days from the date of filing the second amended complaint to file responsive pleadings. Failure to file a second amended complaint as directed will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice without further notice. To the extent that the parties are requesting an extension of time to file responsive pleadings to the amended complaint, because the filing of a second amended complaint will render the previously filed motions to dismiss moot, any such responses in opposition are unnecessary and should not be filed. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/10/2020. (ZRN)
April 9, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to file second Amended Complaint re #3 Amended Complaint by S.Y., C.S. (Hanlon, Sharon)
April 7, 2020 Filing 77 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2020, Discovery due by 6/30/2021, Dispositive motions due by 8/27/2021, Pretrial statement due by 12/3/2021, All other motions due by 12/1/2021, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/30/2020, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 2/17/2021, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 1:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6B before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Trial term commencing 1/3/2022 Ft. Myers Courtroom 6B before Judge Thomas P. Barber. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/30/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/7/2020. (SMG)
April 6, 2020 Filing 76 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hanlon, Sharon)
March 31, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #18 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Miller, John)
March 31, 2020 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Related case order and track 2 notice by Radhey Inc.. (Glassman, Julie)
March 30, 2020 Filing 73 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT (not signed). (Attachments: #1 State Court Other Documents Related Case Notice, #2 State Court Other Documents Discovery Plan)(Hanlon, Sharon) Modified on 3/31/2020 (MLJ). Modified on 4/2/2020, counsel to refile. (MLJ).
March 27, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney John Hamrick, appearing on behalf of Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014520.) Related document: #43 MOTION to appear pro hac vice . (SPB)
March 25, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Bethany K. Biesenthal, appearing on behalf of Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014517.) Related document: #35 MOTION for Bethany B. Biesenthal to appear pro hac vice . (laf)
March 25, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Nicole M. Perry, appearing on behalf of Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014518.) Related document: #34 MOTION for Nicole M. Perry to appear pro hac vice . (laf)
March 19, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., Inn of Naples, LLC, Naples Garden Inn, LLC, Naples Hotel Company. Related case(s): Yes (Casal, Cristobal)
March 19, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Naples Park Central Hotel, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Beebe, Brooke)
March 19, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Uomi & Kudai, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Beebe, Brooke)
March 19, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Shivparvti, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Beebe, Brooke)
March 19, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Holistic Health Healing, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Beebe, Brooke)
March 19, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.. Related case(s): Yes (Beebe, Brooke)
March 19, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss #3 First Amended Complaint by Radhey Inc. (Glassman, Julie)
March 13, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Sara Turner, appearing on behalf of Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014502.). (SPB)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ENDORSED ORDER granting #47 Defendant, Naples Garden Inn, LLC's, Motion Requesting Leave to File a Motion in Excess of 25 Pages. Defendant Naples Garden Inn, LLC, may file a Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support not to exceed forty (40) pages, excluding the case caption and signature block. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/13/2020. (NM)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #45 Defendant, Inn of Naples, LLC's Motion Requesting Leave to File a Motion in Excess of 25 pages. Defendant Inn of Naples, LLC may file a Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support not to exceed forty (40) pages, excluding the case caption and signature block. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/13/2020. (NM)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, and Written Designation and Consent to Act. The Clerk is directed to add John M. Hamrick to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, John M. Hamrick must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, John M. Hamrick must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/13/2020. (NM)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ENDORSED ORDER granting #39 Defendants' Naples Hotel Company d/b/a Gulfcoast Inn Naples and the Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., Motion Requesting Leave to File a Motion in Excess of 25 pages. The Defendants identified in the Motion (Doc. #39), may file a Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support not to exceed forty (40) pages, excluding the case caption and signature block. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/13/2020. (NM)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #34 and #35 the Motions of Nicole M. Perry and Bethany K. Biesenthal for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Written Designation and Consent to Act. The Clerk is directed to add Nicole M. Perry and Bethany K. Biesenthal to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Nicole M. Perry and Bethany K. Biesenthal must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Nicole M. Perry and Bethany K. Biesenthal must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/13/2020. (NM)
March 13, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of correction of firm name for counsel Sharon M. Hanlon by S.Y., C.S. (Hanlon, Sharon)
March 12, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss first amended complaint by Uomi & Kudai, LLC. (Beebe, Brooke)
March 12, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss first amended complaint by Shivparvti, LLC. (Beebe, Brooke)
March 12, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss first amended complaint by Naples Park Central Hotel, LLC. (Beebe, Brooke)
March 12, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss first amended complaint by Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.. (Beebe, Brooke)
March 12, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss first amended complaint by Holistic Health Healing, Inc.. (Beebe, Brooke)
March 12, 2020 Filing 54 REQUEST for oral argument re #53 MOTION to Strike #3 Amended Complaint and/or MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Miller, John)
March 12, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Strike #3 Amended Complaint and/or, MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1)(Miller, John)
March 12, 2020 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., Inn of Naples, LLC, Naples Garden Inn, LLC, Naples Hotel Company. (Casal, Cristobal)
March 12, 2020 Filing 51 REQUEST for oral argument re #33 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Diamantas, Kyle)
March 12, 2020 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Related case order and track 2 notice by Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Mars Merger Sub, LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Reagan, Amanda)
March 12, 2020 Filing 49 REQUEST for oral argument re #48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wyndham Franchisor, LLC, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Phillips, J.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Wyndham Franchisor, LLC, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Phillips, J.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION requesting leave to file a Motion in Excess of 25 Pages by Naples Garden Inn, LLC. (Casal, Cristobal)
March 12, 2020 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Related case order and track 2 notice by Naples Garden Inn, LLC. (Casal, Cristobal)
March 12, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to file a Motion in Excess of 25 Pages by Inn of Naples, LLC. (Casal, Cristobal)
March 12, 2020 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Related case order and track 2 notice by Inn of Naples, LLC. (Casal, Cristobal)
March 12, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for John M. Hamrick to appear pro hac vice by Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC. (Holtmann, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
March 12, 2020 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Related case order and track 2 notice by Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC. (Holtmann, Michael)
March 12, 2020 Filing 41 REQUEST for oral argument re #40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC. (Holtmann, Michael)
March 12, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC. (Holtmann, Michael)
March 12, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION requesting leave to File a Motion in Excess of 25 Pages by Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., Naples Hotel Company. (Casal, Cristobal)
March 12, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Related case order and track 2 notice by Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., Naples Hotel Company. (Casal, Cristobal)
March 12, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Mars Merger Sub, LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Reagan, Amanda)
March 12, 2020 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Related case order and track 2 notice by Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Miller, John)
March 12, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Bethany B. Biesenthal to appear pro hac vice by Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Miller, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
March 12, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Nicole M. Perry to appear pro hac vice by Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
March 12, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Sever and to Strike by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diamantas, Kyle)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER granting #30 Defendants Wyndham Franchisor, LLC's and Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.'s (the "Wyndham Defendants") Unopposed Motion Requesting Leave to File a Motion in Excess of 25 Pages. The Wyndham Defendants may file a Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support not to exceed forty (40) pages, excluding the case caption and signature block. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/12/2020. (NM)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER granting #29 Defendants' Motion Requesting Leave to File a Motion in Excess of 25 Pages. The Defendants identified in the Motion (Doc. #29) may file a Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support not to exceed forty (40) pages, excluding the case caption and signature block. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/12/2020. (NM)
March 11, 2020 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION requesting Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss in Excess of 25 Pages by Wyndham Franchisor, LLC, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Phillips, J.)
March 11, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION requesting Leave to File a Motion in Excess of 25 Pages by Holistic Health Healing, Inc., Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC., Naples Park Central Hotel, LLC, Shivparvti, LLC, Uomi & Kudai, LLC. (Beebe, Brooke)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER: "Radhey, Inc. d/b/a Tamiami Motel's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint" (Doc. #27) is granted. Defendant Radhey, Inc. may answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 19, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/9/2020. (ZRN)
March 9, 2020 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint by Radhey Inc. (Cosio, Eduardo)
March 9, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Related case order and notice by Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Diamantas, Kyle)
March 9, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #18 Related case order and notice by Wyndham Franchisor, LLC, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. (Phillips, J.)
March 9, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of correction of email address of Yale T. Freeman, P.A. by S.Y., C. S. (Freeman, Yale)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Written Designation and Consent to Act, and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filing. The Clerk is directed to add Sara M. Turner to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Sara M. Turner must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Sara M. Turner must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/9/2020. (NM)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Defendant Choice Hotels International, Inc.'s Motion Requesting Leave to File a Motion in Excess of 25 Pages. Defendant Choice Hotel may file a Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support not to exceed forty (40) pages, excluding the case caption and signature block. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/9/2020. (NM)
March 6, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to file motion in excess of 25 pages and memorandum of law by Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Diamantas, Kyle)
March 6, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Sara M. Turner to appear pro hac vice by Choice Hotels International, Inc.. (Diamantas, Kyle) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
March 6, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of compliance re #18 Related case order and track 2 notice by Master Cleaners Pro Services Inc. (Reiss, Andrew)
March 5, 2020 Filing 18 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/19/2020. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/5/2020. (jmc)
March 3, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #13 Answer to amended complaint filed by S.Y., C. S. (Hanlon, Sharon)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER: The motions for extension of time brought by Defendants Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., Inn of Naples, LLC, Naples Hotel Company, and Naples Garden Inn, LLC (Docs. #14, #15) are hereby granted. Defendants may answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/2/2020. (ZRN)
February 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #3 Amended Complaint by Naples Garden Inn, LLC. (Casal, Cristobal)
February 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #3 Amended Complaint by Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., Inn of Naples, LLC, Naples Hotel Company. (Casal, Cristobal)
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Amended Complaint by Master Cleaners Pro Services Inc..(Reiss, Andrew)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting the motions for extensions of time filed by Defendants Shivparvti, LLC d/b/a Sunrise Motel, Holistic Health Healing, Inc. d/b/a Conty's Motel, Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC d/b/a Glades Motel, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Mars Merger Sub, LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC, Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts Inc., and Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Docs. #4, #5, #6, #7, #8, #9, #10, & #11). The Defendants may file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 2/26/2020. (ZRN)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #3 Amended Complaint by Choice Hotels International, Inc. (Diamantas, Kyle)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #3 Amended Complaint by Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Hilton Worldwide, Inc., Park Hotels & Resorts Inc. (Miller, John)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #3 Amended Complaint by Marriott Hotel Services, Inc., Marriott International, Inc., Mars Merger Sub, LLC, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc., Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC. (Reagan, Amanda)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer as to #3 Amended Complaint by Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC. (Holtmann, Michael)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint by Wyndham Franchisor, LLC, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.. (Phillips, J.)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint by Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC d/b/a Glades Motel (filed in State Court on 2/11/2020). (MLJ)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint by Holistic Health Healing, Inc. d/b/a Conty's Motel (filed in State Court on 2/11/2020). (MLJ)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint by Shivparvti, LLC d/b/a Sunrise Motel (filed in State Court on 2/11/2020). (MLJ)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Best Western International, Inc. d/b/a Best Western Naples Inn & Suites, Best Western International, Inc. d/b/a Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel, Choice Hotels International, Inc. d/b/a Comfort Inn & Executive Suites, Choice Hotels International, Inc. d/b/a Quality Inn & Suites Golf Resort, Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn, Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn, Hilton Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn, Gregory Hines, Holistic Health Healing, Inc. d/b/a Conty's Motel, Inn of Naples, LLC d/b/a Inn of Naples, Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation d/b/a Holiday Inn Express, Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation d/b/a Staybridge Suites, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC d/b/a Holiday Inn Express, Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC d/b/a Staybridge Suites, Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC d/b/a Glades Motel, John Doe, as agent of Naples Hotel Company d/b/a Gulfcoast Inn Naples and/or The Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., Keith Lewis, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott, Marriott International, Inc. d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, Marriott International, Inc. d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott, Mars Merger Sub, LLC d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, Mars Merger Sub, LLC d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott, Master Cleaners Pro Services Inc. d/b/a Sunrise Motel, Naples Garden Inn, LLC d/b/a Naples Garden Inn, Naples Hotel Company d/b/a Gulfcoast Inn Naples, Naples Park Central Hotel, LLC d/b/a Naples Park Central Hotel, Park Hotels & Resorts Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn, Shivparvti, LLC d/b/a Sunrise Motel, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott, Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott, The Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc., Uomi & Kudai, LLC d/b/a Spinnaker Inn, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Days Inn & Suites, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Ramada by Wyndham Naples, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Super 8 by Wyndham, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Days Inn & Suites, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a La Quinta Inn, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Ramada by Wyndham Naples, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Super 8 by Wyndham with Jury Demand filed by S. Y., C. S. (filed in State Court on 12/31/2019).(MLJ)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-118-FtM-60MRM. (SJB)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL (JOINT) from Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit in and for Collier County, FL, case number 11-2019-CA-004318-0001-XX filed in State Court on 10-30-2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16506849 filed by Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Days Inn & Suites, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Days Inn & Suites, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a La Quinta Inn, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Super 8 by Wyndham, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Ramada by Wyndham Naples, Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Super 8 by Wyndham, Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Ramada by Wyndham Naples. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exh. A - State Court Amended Complaint, #2 State Court Pending Motions Exh. B - State Court Pending Motions, #3 State Court Docket Sheet Exh. C - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 State Court Other Documents Exh. D - State Court Other Documents, #5 Exhibit Exh. E - State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit Exh. F - Consent to Removal (Radhey), #7 Civil Cover Sheet Exh. G - Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Y. et al v. Naples Hotel Company et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC d/b/a Holiday Inn Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Cleaners Pro Services Inc. d/b/a Sunrise Motel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inn of Naples, LLC d/b/a Inn of Naples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation d/b/a Holiday Inn Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naples Hotel Company d/b/a Gulfcoast Inn Naples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uomi & Kudai, LLC d/b/a Spinnaker Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, as agent of Naples Hotel Company d/b/a Gulfcoast Inn Naples and/or The Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a La Quinta Inn
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radhey Inc. d/b/a Tamiami Motel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Super 8 by Wyndham
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Western International, Inc. d/b/a Best Western Naples Inn & Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shivparvti, LLC d/b/a Sunrise Motel
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Dennis Michael Arendall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc. d/b/a Comfort Inn & Executive Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars Merger Sub, LLC d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Super 8 by Wyndham
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naples Garden Inn, LLC d/b/a Naples Garden Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide, Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Ramada by Wyndham Naples
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a La Quinta Inn
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Hotels & Resorts Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holistic Health Healing, Inc. d/b/a Conty's Motel
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Dennis Michael Arendall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Western International, Inc. d/b/a Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC d/b/a Glades Motel
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Dennis Michael Arendall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc. d/b/a Quality Inn & Suites Golf Resort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Ramada by Wyndham Naples
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC d/b/a Staybridge Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Hotel Services, Inc. d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Franchisor, LLC d/b/a Days Inn & Suites
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc. d/b/a Hampton Inn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc. d/b/a Days Inn & Suites
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC d/b/a Residence Inn by Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation d/b/a Staybridge Suites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naples Park Central Hotel, LLC d/b/a Naples Park Central Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars Merger Sub, LLC d/b/a Fairfield Inn & Suites by Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & M REAL ESTATE COMPANY INC., d/b/a COMFORT INN & EXECUTIVE SUITES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIE TOLLGATE BLVD LLC d/b/a HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPLES GARDEN INN, LLC, d/b/a NAPLES GARDEN INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASTER CLEANERS PRO SERVICES INC, d/b/a SUNRISE MOTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAXMI OF NAPLES, LLC d/b/a SUPER 8 BY WYNDHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. O'Day
Represented By: Fredrick H. L. McClure
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Amanda Reagan
Represented By: Michael Bakhama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPLES CFC ENTERPRISES LTD d/b/a STAYBRIDGE SUITES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAPLES HOTEL COMPANY, d/b/a GULFCOAST INN NAPLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSM CORPORATION d/b/a RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Hotels & Resorts Inc.
Represented By: John McQueen Miller, III
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., d/b/a QUALITY INN & SUITES GOLF RESORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inn of Naples, LLC
Represented By: Cristobal Antonio Casal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radhey Inc.
Represented By: Julie Bork Glassman
Represented By: Eduardo Cosio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANUMAN OF NAPLES LLC d/b/a DAY INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEA SHELL MANAGEMENT, LLC, d/b/a SEA SHELL MOTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP PLC d/b/a HOLIDAY INN EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. O'Day
Represented By: Fredrick H. L. McClure
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Amanda Reagan
Represented By: Michael Bakhama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP LLC d/b/a STAYBRIDGE SUITES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARK SHORE RESORT CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. d/b/a PARKSHORE RESORTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC.
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Dennis Michael Arendall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSM RI NAPLES LLC d/b/a RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLISTIC HEALTH HEALING, INC., d/b/a CONTY'S MOTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAPORTA FLORIDA CENTER LLC d/b/a NAPLES GARDEN INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naples Hotel Company
Represented By: Cristobal Antonio Casal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Western International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naples Garden Inn, LLC
Represented By: Cristobal Antonio Casal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAYTON PLAZA, LLC, d/b/a SEA SHELL MOTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naples Park Central Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Dennis Michael Arendall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT VOCISANO, d/b/a QUALITY INN & SUITES GOLF RESORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Cleaners Pro Services Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Reiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA QUINTA PROPERTIES, INC. d/b/a LA QUINTA INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulfcoast Inn of Naples Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Cristobal Antonio Casal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. I. NAPLES LLC d/b/a DAYS INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars Merger Sub, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. O'Day
Represented By: Fredrick H. L. McClure
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Amanda Reagan
Represented By: Michael Bakhama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UOMI & KUDAI, LLC, d/b/a SPINNAKER INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Hotels International, Inc.
Represented By: Sara M. Turner
Represented By: Kyle A. Diamantas
Represented By: Samuel L. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. O'Day
Represented By: Fredrick H. L. McClure
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Amanda Reagan
Represented By: Michael Bakhama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNSTREAM HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC d/b/a PARKSHORE RESORTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R & M REAL ESTATE CO INC, d/b/a BEST WESTERN NAPLES PLAZA HOTEL; ROBERT VOCISANO CO-TR, d/b/a BEST WESTERN NAPLES PLAZA HOTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHREE SIDDHIVINAYAK HOSPITALITY, LLC d/b/a DAYS INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA QUINTA HOLDINGS INC. d/b/a LA QUINTA INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY VARAHIMATA INVESTMENTS, LLC, d/b/a GLADES MOTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation
Represented By: Michael Anthony Holtmann
Represented By: William Newton Shepherd
Represented By: John M. Hamrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COREPOINT LODGING, INC. and CPLG LLC d/b/a LA QUINTA INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercontinental Hotels Group Resources, LLC
Represented By: Michael Anthony Holtmann
Represented By: William Newton Shepherd
Represented By: John M. Hamrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Domestic Operating Company Inc.
Represented By: John McQueen Miller, III
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Represented By: Fredrick H. L. McClure
Represented By: David S. Sagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ FL PROPERTIES LLC, name change CPLG FL PROPERTIES LLC d/b/a LA QUINTA INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.
Represented By: John McQueen Miller, III
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT, LLC d/b/a RESIDENCE INN BY MARRIOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shivparvti, LLC
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Dennis Michael Arendall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: John McQueen Miller, III
Represented By: Bethany K. Biesenthal
Represented By: Nicole M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHOICE HOTELS INTERNATIONAL, INC., d/b/a COMFORT INN & EXECUTIVE SUITES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYNDHAM HOTELS & RESORTS, INC. d/b/a DAYS INN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holistic Health Healing, Inc.
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Dennis Michael Arendall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uomi & Kudai, LLC
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Dennis Michael Arendall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Hotels & Resorts Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. O'Day
Represented By: Fredrick H. L. McClure
Represented By: Ellen E. Dew
Represented By: Amanda Reagan
Represented By: Michael Bakhama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Franchisor, LLC
Represented By: J. Trumon Phillips
Represented By: Fredrick H. L. McClure
Represented By: David S. Sagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INN OF NAPLES HOTEL, LLC, d/b/a INN OF NAPLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEASONAL INVESTMENTS, INC., d/b/a FAIRWAYS INN OF NAPLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIST PROPERTIES LLC d/b/a RAMADA BY WYNDHAM NAPLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC., d/b/a BEST WESTERN NAPLES PLAZA HOTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHIVPARVTI, LLC, d/b/a SUNRISE MOTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GULFCOAST INN OF NAPLES OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., d/b/a GULFCOAST INN NAPLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. S.
Represented By: Sharon M. Hanlon
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Diana Yastrovskaya
Represented By: Yale T. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Represented By: Sharon M. Hanlon
Represented By: Michael A. London
Represented By: Diana Yastrovskaya
Represented By: Yale T. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?