Adderly v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Elione J. Adderly
Defendant: FNU Peer, FNU Paraschuk, John Doe, FNU Swat, FNU Dorio, FNU Groski, FNU Ticsh, Officer Martin, FNU Perno, FNU Norriegger, FNU Dubrey, Colonel Robinson, D. Koel, FNU Otwell, FNU Ostrameki, Z. Ditoro, Officer Lee, FNU Stall, FNU Trejo, FNU Trujillo, FNU Montalvo, FNU Zelane, Officer Walton, FNU Mundella and FNU Ashley
Case Number: 2:2020cv00184
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Ashley, FNU Dubrey, FNU Montalvo, FNU Norriegger, FNU Peer with Jury Demand. Terminating FNU Dorio (Ofc.), FNU Groski (Ofc.), D. Koel (Classification Officer), Officer Lee, Officer Martin, FNU Mundella (Sgt.), FNU Ostrameki (Capt.), FNU Otwell (Ofc.), FNU Paraschuk (Nurse), FNU Perno (Ofc.), Colonel Robinson, FNU Stall (Nurse), FNU Swat (Sgt.), FNU Ticsh (Ofc.), FNU Trejo (Ofc.), FNU Trujillo (Ofc.), Officer Walton, FNU Zelane (Nurse), Z. Ditoro (Lt.) and John Doe (Ofc.) filed by Elione J. Adderly. Related document: #7 Amended Complaint filed by Elione J. Adderly. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. #7) is DISMISSED without prejudice. ORDER to file amended complaint. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that complies with this Order within FOURTEEN DAYS of the date on this Order. The Clerk of Court shall mail Plaintiff a blank Civil Rights Complaint Form marked "Amended Complaint" with the assigned case number. Plaintiff's failure to timely file an amended complaint or explain his inability to timely comply will cause the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Complaint Form)(SLU)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Ashley, Z. Ditoro, John Doe, FNU Dorio, FNU Dubrey, FNU Groski, D. Koel, Officer Lee, Officer Martin, FNU Montalvo, FNU Mundella, FNU Norriegger, FNU Ostrameki, FNU Otwell, FNU Paraschuk, FNU Peer, FNU Perno, Colonel Robinson, FNU Stall, FNU Swat, FNU Ticsh, FNU Trejo, FNU Trujillo, Officer Walton, FNU Zelane filed by Elione J. Adderly. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Elione J. Adderly. (Attachments: #1 Declaration E. Adderly, #2 Declaration of Donnie Hammett, #3 Mailing Envelope) (no service copies provided) (SLU) Modified on 4/22/2020 to edit docket text (SLU).
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 PARTIAL PRISONER consent form and financial certificate by Elione J. Adderly. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/3/2020. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/20/2020. (SLU)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/20/2020. (SLU)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER regarding prisoner consent form and financial certificate. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/20/2020. (SLU)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Elione J. Adderly. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Ashley, Z. Ditoro, John Doe, FNU Dorio, FNU Dubrey, FNU Groski, D. Koel, Officer Lee, Officer Martin, FNU Montalvo, FNU Mundella, FNU Norriegger, FNU Ostrameki, FNU Otwell, FNU Paraschuk, FNU Peer, FNU Perno, Colonel Robinson, FNU Stall, FNU Swat, FNU Ticsh, FNU Trejo, FNU Trujillo, Officer Walton, FNU Zelane filed by Elione J. Adderly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Mailing Envelope) (no service copies)(SLU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adderly v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Peer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Paraschuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Swat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Dorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Groski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ticsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Perno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Norriegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Dubrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Koel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Otwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ostrameki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z. Ditoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Stall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Trejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Montalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Zelane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Mundella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elione J. Adderly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?