Minden Pictures, Inc. v. Grace Lakes Florist, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Minden Pictures, Inc.
Defendant: April L. Wood and Grace Lakes Florist, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00510
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 08/07/2020 by Minden Pictures, Inc. as to Grace Lakes Florist, Inc., April L. Wood. (Rothman, Joel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Grace Lakes Florist, Inc., April L. Wood. (RMT)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/17/2020. (jmc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-510-FtM-66MRM. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Minden Pictures, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Rothman, Joel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Rothman, Joel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Grace Lakes Florist, Inc., April L. Wood with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17070190) filed by Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Form AO121)(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minden Pictures, Inc. v. Grace Lakes Florist, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April L. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Lakes Florist, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minden Pictures, Inc.
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Represented By: Craig Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?