CMR Construction and Roofing v. Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: CMR Construction and Roofing a/a/o Quarry Community Association, Inc. and CMR Construction & Roofing LLC
Defendant: Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00512
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant's motion for leave to file a reply #19 in support of its pending motion to dismiss #15 is GRANTED. The reply shall be filed no later than 09/18/2020 and shall not exceed three pages. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 9/14/2020. (VK)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company. (Caceres, J.)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by CMR Construction & Roofing LLC. (Mejeur, Jordan)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #4 is DENIED AS MOOT because an Amended Complaint #7 has been filed. The Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint #15 remains pending. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 8/24/2020. (VK)
August 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Caceres, J.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Caceres, J.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Empire Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company Ltd for Empire Indemnity Insurance Company.. (Caceres, J.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Caceres, J.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Caceres, J.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by CMR Construction & Roofing LLC. (Mejeur, Jordan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Notice of Removal Alleging Diversity Jurisdiction filed by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Caceres, J.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report and Pretrial & Discovery Plan by 10/1/2020.All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 20512. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David William Davich on behalf of CMR Construction & Roofing LLC (Davich, David)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT CMR a/a/o Quarry Community Association Inc. against Empire Indemnity Insurance Company with Jury Demand. filed by CMR Construction & Roofing LLC.(Mejeur, Jordan)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/4/2020. (WRW)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1) No later than Wednesday, August 12, 2020, Empire must file a supplemental memorandum of law that adequately alleges diversity jurisdiction.2) Failure to comply with this order will result in remand without further notice. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 7/29/2020. (SMG)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company. (Caceres, J.)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-512-FtM-66NPM. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Empire Indemnity Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed in State Court on 6/5/20 by CMR Construction & Roofing LLC.(drn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Collier, case number 2020-CA-001810 filed in State Court on 6/5/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17072166 filed by Empire Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D)(Caceres, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMR Construction and Roofing v. Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMR Construction and Roofing a/a/o Quarry Community Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMR Construction & Roofing LLC
Represented By: David William Davich
Represented By: Jordan Todd Mejeur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Pablo Caceres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?