Howdeshell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Howdeshell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00514
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Deborah Ann Howdeshell. Related case(s): n (Berke, Bill)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/4/2020. (WRW)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER in re: courtesy paper copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/8/15. (drn)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (drn)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (drn)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-514-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17073024) filed by Deborah Ann Howdeshell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons OGC, #3 Proposed Summons USAG, #4 Proposed Summons USAO)(Berke, Bill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howdeshell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ann Howdeshell
Represented By: Bill B. Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?