Martinez v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Aviesel Martinez
Respondent: Department of Justice and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00539
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-22688. File received electronically
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE Closing Case. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (tsr) [Transferred from flsd on 7/31/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this matter is no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Reid for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/30/2020. (tsr) [Transferred from flsd on 7/31/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 6/29/2020 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS100210782 (pcs) [Transferred from flsd on 7/31/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pcs) [Transferred from flsd on 7/31/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00, filed by Aviesel Martinez.(pcs) [Transferred from flsd on 7/31/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aviesel Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?