Christoff v. Inglese et al
Plaintiff: Michael J Christoff
Defendant: Northstar Technologies Group, Inc., Galexa, Inc and Paul Inglese
Case Number: 2:2020cv00546
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #5 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Northstar Technologies Group, Inc.. (Nelles, Matthew)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Paul Inglese, Northstar Technologies Group, Inc..(Nelles, Matthew)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/4/2020. (WRW)
July 30, 2020 REFUND for payment. Case 2:20CV544 was deleted. Receipt number 113A-17108616 refunded in the amount of $ 400.00 paid to Ian Holmes.. (NLC)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MLS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Galexa, Inc, Paul Inglese, Northstar Technologies Group, Inc.. (MLS)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-546-FtM-38NPM. (SJB)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Galexa, Inc, Paul Inglese, Northstar Technologies Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17108725) filed by Michael J Christoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Fraser, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christoff v. Inglese et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Technologies Group, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew S. Nelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galexa, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Inglese
Represented By: Matthew S. Nelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J Christoff
Represented By: David P. Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?