Herc Rentals, Inc. et al v. Hinman et al
Plaintiff: HERC RENTALS INC, HERC HOLDINGS INC., Herc Rentals, Inc. and Herc Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: SCOTT HINMAN, PREMIER TRUCK RENTAL LLC and Premier Truck Rental, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00601
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (drn)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE canceling Status Conference hearing. (AEH)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER. Before the Court is the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. #14) filed on August 31, 2020. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) allows a plaintiff to dismiss an action voluntarily if a stipulation of dismissal is signed by all parties who have appeared. The dismissal is effective upon filing and requires no further action by the Court. See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012). Here, the parties stipulate to dismissing this case with prejudice. Accordingly, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, terminate all pending motions and deadlines, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/31/2020. (NMC)
August 31, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Herc Holdings, Inc., Herc Rentals, Inc.. (Davis, Kelly)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Scott Hinman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A to Defendant Hinman's Resp. in Opp. to Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Defendant Hinman's Resp. in Opp. to Motion)(Saenz, Ruben)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 10/12/2020. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant Premier Truck Rental, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Premier Truck Rental, LLC must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #3) no later than 8/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/25/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Premier Truck Rental, LLC. (Atwood, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/24/2020. (WRW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING: a Status Conference is set for 9/4/2020 at 9:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. As per the Court's 8/20/2020 order (Doc. #7, the request for a preliminary injunction will be addressed at the Status Conference. PLEASE NOTE: This hearing will be conducted via Zoom video conference; participants to receive instructions for joining the hearing separately. (AEH)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' request for a temporary restraining order. The Court will hold a remote hearing on Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction on September 4th, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. via Zoom. Defendants shall file a response brief and any affidavits or other evidence on or before August 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/20/2020. (CMC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Scott Hinman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Saenz, Ruben)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-601-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Herc Holdings, Inc., Herc Rentals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - B, #2 Exhibit C - F)(drn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing verification by Herc Holdings, Inc., Herc Rentals, Inc. re #3 Complaint. (drn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Scott Hinman, Premier Truck Rental, LLC filed in State Court on 7/28/20 by Herc Rentals, Inc., Herc Holdings, Inc. (drn)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the 20th Judicial Circuit, case number 20-CA-004868 filed in State Court on 07-28-2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17195373 filed by SCOTT HINMAN. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Pending Motions, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 State Court Other Documents, #7 State Court Other Documents, #8 State Court Other Documents, #9 State Court Pending Motions, #10 State Court Pending Motions, #11 State Court Pending Motions, #12 State Court Pending Motions, #13 State Court Docket Sheet, #14 Exhibit B)(Saenz, Ruben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herc Rentals, Inc. et al v. Hinman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT HINMAN
Represented By: Ruben Martin Saenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIER TRUCK RENTAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Truck Rental, LLC
Represented By: Scott Edward Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERC RENTALS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERC HOLDINGS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herc Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Lyon Davis
Represented By: Alexis Marie Barkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herc Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Lyon Davis
Represented By: Alexis Marie Barkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?