S.Y. v. Seasonal Investments, Inc.
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Defendant: Seasonal Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00603
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
2 Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of compliance re 15 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by S. Y. (Hanlon, Sharon)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion of Virginia E. Anello, Esq. for Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Virginia E. Anello to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must send only one required fee to the Clerk's Office for her special appearance in the first-filed Case No. 2:20-cv-118-JES-MRM. The Court hereby waives the required fee for special admission in connection with all other cases pending in the Fort Myers Division in which Virginia E. Anello is granted leave to appear specially for Plaintiffs S.Y. and/or C.S. This waiver does not apply to any other case in which Virginia E. Anello may seek leave to appear specially for any other party or in any other case pending in another Division. Additionally, given the unique procedural posture of this litigation--including the severance of the first-filed action, the resulting proliferation of separate cases, and the relatedness of the claims and defenses involved in each of the severed actions--the Court finds that Virginia E. Anello's appearance in each severed case brought on behalf of S.Y. and C.S. does not constitute the maintenance of a regular practice of law in Florida such that her special appearance should be denied. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/16/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sample Order, #2 Exhibit B - Sample Order, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Order)(Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Contacted Counsel, pleading filed in incorrect case. Modified on 10/15/2020 (RMT).
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant, Seasonal Investments, Inc's [sic] Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike, or for a More Definite Statement. Plaintiff must respond to the pending dispositive motion (Doc. #10) no later than 11/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/7/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss complaint , Motion to Strike, or for a More Definite Statement and Memorandum of Law by S. Y.. (Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE to counsel Virginia E. Anello of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
September 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Seasonal Investments, Inc.. (Beebe, Brooke)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Defendant, Seasonal Investments, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1) no later than 9/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/18/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Seasonal Investments, Inc.. (Beebe, Brooke) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF of service by S. Y. (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/24/2020. (WRW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge John E. Steele. New case number: 2:20-cv-603-FtM-29MRM. Judge John L. Badalamenti no longer assigned to the case. (laf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Seasonal Investments, Inc.. (drn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-603-FtM-66MRM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by S. Y.. Related case(s): Yes (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seasonal Investments, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17197862) filed by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Seasonal Investments, Inc.)(Hanlon, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.Y. v. Seasonal Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Represented By: Diana Yastrovskaya
Represented By: Yale T. Freeman
Represented By: Brian J. Perkins
Represented By: Virginia E. Anello
Represented By: Sharon M. Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seasonal Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Brooke E. Beebe
Represented By: Daniel Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Dennis Michael Arendall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?