Accident Insurance Company, Inc. v. V & A Drywall And Stucco, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. and Accident Insurance Company, Inc
Defendant: Lennar Homes, LLC, Platinum Service Contracting, LLC, Michael J. McCauley, V&A Drywall and Stucco, Inc., Kathleen McCauley, Kathleen A. McCauley and Frank Winston Crum Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00613
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (drn)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, terminate any pending deadlines, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/17/2020. (AEH)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Brief Ten (10) Day Extension to File Amended Complaint and Brief in Response to Court Order [D.E. 3]. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint and a brief regarding ripeness in response to the Court's Order (Doc. #3) no later than 9/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/9/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Supporting Brief on Ripeness by Accident Insurance Company, Inc. (Ehrlich, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/24/2020. (WRW)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED: Plaintiff Accident Insurance Company, Inc. (AIC)'s Complaint for Declaratory Relief (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. AIC may file an amended complaint on or before September 4, 2020. If AIC does not file an amended complaint by that date, the Court will close this case without further notice. If AIC files an amended complaint, it must be accompanied by a brief--not to exceed five pages--addressing ripeness. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/21/2020. (AEH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-613-FTM-38MRM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17200073) filed by Accident Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Cancellation Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Sub-subcontract (V&A), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ehrlich, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Accident Insurance Company, Inc. v. V & A Drywall And Stucco, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Homes, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum Service Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V&A Drywall and Stucco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Winston Crum Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: David S Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Accident Insurance Company, Inc
Represented By: David S Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?