Dero Roofing, LLC v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: William Ryan and Dero Roofing, LLC
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00614
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice (joint) per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Federal Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Sonenblum, Zachary)
October 12, 2020 Filing 23 PRETRIAL AND DISCOVERY PLAN. (Sonenblum, Zachary)
October 12, 2020 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sonenblum, Zachary)
October 9, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #4 Complaint with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company.(Sonenblum, Zachary)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Defendant, Federal Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #4) no later than 10/13/2020 because the deadline requested in the motion is a federal holiday. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/25/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Complaint by Federal Insurance Company. (Sonenblum, Zachary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Defendant, Federal Insurance Company's Motion for Clarification / Reconsideration as to the Court's 9-18-2020 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part, Unopposed Motion for Extension of to Complete the Rule 26 Conference. The Court hereby clarifies that the Court's Order dated 9/18/2020 (Doc. 16) grants limited authorization to Plaintiff's counsel of record to participate in the case management conference and in the preparation of the joint Case Management Report while counsel's admission to this Court's Bar is pending. Plaintiff's counsel must make every effort to be admitted to this Court's bar or otherwise seek admission pro hac vice before the Preliminary Pretrial Conference occurs on 10/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/23/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
September 18, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Clarification re 16 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File by Federal Insurance Company. (Sonenblum, Zachary)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Defendant, Federal Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete the Rule 26 Conference. The motion is granted to the extent Defendant requests an extension of time to conduct the case management conference in this case. The case management conference must occur on or before 10/5/2020. As previously instructed (see Doc. 12), the parties must file a joint Case Management Report no later than 10/12/2020. The Court grants limited authorization to Defendant's counsel of record to participate in the case management conference and in the preparation of the joint Case Management Report while counsel's admission to this Court's Bar is pending. The motion is denied to the extent it seeks any greater or different relief. Defendant's counsel must make every effort to be admitted to this Court's bar or otherwise seek admission pro hac vice before the Preliminary Pretrial Conference occurs on 10/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/18/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Conference by Federal Insurance Company. (Sonenblum, Zachary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice by Federal Insurance Company. (Sonenblum, Zachary)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE to counsel Matthew J. Lemakos of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 10/12/2020. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Federal Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Federal Insurance Company must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #4) no later than 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/25/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Defendant, Federal Insurance Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Discovery Requests. The subject motion was filed before this case was removed to federal court. As such, the motion was not filed in compliance with the rules governing these federal court proceedings. Defendant may renew the motion, if appropriate, in compliance with the rules governing these federal court proceedings. In that regard, the timing of Defendant's response to the Complaint is governed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 81(c)(2) and the timing of discovery is governed by M.D. Fla. R. 3.05(c)(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/25/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER. On August 20, 2020, the Court directed Defendant to show cause why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (Doc. #3). Based on Defendant's response (Doc. #6), the Court will take no further action on its Order (Doc. #3) at this time. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/25/2020. (KRH)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/24/2020. (WRW)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 Complaint by Federal Insurance Company. (Sonenblum, Zachary) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Zachary D. Sonenblum re: #3 Order, #1 Notice of Removal by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Affidavit in Response to Order to Show Cause Supplementing Notice of Removal - Dero Roofing Articles of Incorporation)(Sonenblum, Zachary)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Defendant to SUPPLEMENT the Notice of Removal on or before August 27, 2020, to show cause why the case should not be remanded for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the case being remanded without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/20/2020. (CMC)
August 20, 2020 FEE PAID. Filing fee for new civil case, Receipt No. 113A-17203079 for $400 paid. (Sonenblum, Zachary)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and discovery requests re #4 Complaint by Federal Insurance Company. (drn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed in State Court on 5/26/20 by Dero Roofing, LLC.(drn)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-614-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Collier County, case number 2020-CA-01679 filed in State Court on 5/26/20. filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 State Court COMPLAINT State Court Complaint, #5 State Court Other Documents Notice of Serving Interrogatories, #6 State Court Other Documents Request for Production, #7 State Court Other Documents Summons, #8 State Court Other Documents Standing Order, #9 State Court Other Documents E-filing Receipt, #10 State Court Pending Motions Pending Motion for Extension of Time, #11 Affidavit Affidavit of Zachary D. Sonenblum, Esq., #12 Exhibit Sunbiz Records, #13 Exhibit Estimate)(Sonenblum, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dero Roofing, LLC v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dero Roofing, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Lemakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Zachary David Sonenblum
Represented By: Laura Farach Farrant
Represented By: Bradley S. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?