Hastings v. Secretary Department of Corrections (Lee County)
Petitioner: David S. Hastings
Respondent: Secretary Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2020cv00615
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion specifically for release on bail by personal recognizance pending Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/15/2020. (SLU)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for release on bail by personal recognizance pending Habeas Corpus by David S. Hastings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Mailing Envelope)(MLS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Salemi Ashby on behalf of Secretary Department of Corrections (Ashby, Katie)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. On or before September 8, 2020, counsel for Respondent is DIRECTED to file a notice of appearance. Response to petition due by 11/23/2020. On or before November 30, 2020, Respondent is DIRECTED to electronically file the state court record on CM/ECF. Petitioner has 30 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. If applicable, the Clerk is DIRECTED to dismiss all named Respondents except for the Secretary of the Florida Department of Corrections and terminate them from the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Emergency Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(SLU)
August 24, 2020 FEES paid by David S. Hastings (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number FtM014781) (RMT)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/20/2020. (RMT)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER Regarding Habeas Petition Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/20/2020. (RMT)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State (no service copies provided; no fee/ifp) filed by David S. Hastings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hastings v. Secretary Department of Corrections (Lee County)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Department of Corrections
Represented By: Katie Salemi Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David S. Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?