S.Y. v. Best Western International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Defendant: Robert Vocisano, R&M Real Estate Co Inc dba Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel and Best Western International, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00616
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
2 Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of compliance re 23 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by S. Y. (Hanlon, Sharon)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Motion of Virginia E. Anello, Esq. for Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Virginia E. Anello to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must send only one required fee to the Clerk's Office for her special appearance in the first-filed Case No. 2:20-cv-118-JES-MRM. The Court hereby waives the required fee for special admission in connection with all other cases pending in the Fort Myers Division in which Virginia E. Anello is granted leave to appear specially for Plaintiffs S.Y. and/or C.S. This waiver does not apply to any other case in which Virginia E. Anello may seek leave to appear specially for any other party or in any other case pending in another Division. Additionally, given the unique procedural posture of this litigation--including the severance of the first-filed action, the resulting proliferation of separate cases, and the relatedness of the claims and defenses involved in each of the severed actions--the Court finds that Virginia E. Anello's appearance in each severed case brought on behalf of S.Y. and C.S. does not constitute the maintenance of a regular practice of law in Florida such that her special appearance should be denied. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/16/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 15, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sample Order, #2 Exhibit B - Sample Order, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Order)(Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant, Best Western International, Inc.'s, Motion to Dismiss Counts I-IV of Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum. Plaintiff must respond to the motion to dismiss (Doc. 18) no later than 11/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/14/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint with prejudice and memorandum in support by R&M Real Estate Co Inc dba Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel, Robert Vocisano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Torrez, Christyna)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I-IV of Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support by S. Y.. (Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I-IV of Plaintiff's re #1 Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Best Western International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Zeiger, Michelle)
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE to counsel Virginia E. Anello of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Track 2 notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by R&M Real Estate Co Inc dba Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel, Robert Vocisano. (Coleman, J.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #5 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Best Western International, Inc.. (Zeiger, Michelle)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Zeiger on behalf of Best Western International, Inc. (Zeiger, Michelle)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants R&M Real Estate Company, Inc. and Robert Vocisano must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1) no later than 10/13/2020 because the date requested in the motion is a federal holiday. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/18/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by R&M Real Estate Co Inc dba Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel, Robert Vocisano. (Torrez, Christyna) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christyna M. Torrez on behalf of R&M Real Estate Co Inc dba Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel, Robert Vocisano (Torrez, Christyna)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 09/09/2020 by S. Y. as to Robert Vocisano. (Hanlon, Sharon)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 08/31/2020 by S. Y. as to Best Western International, Inc.. (Hanlon, Sharon)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 08/27/2020 by S. Y. as to R&M Real Estate Co Inc dba Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel. (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge John E. Steele. New case number: 2:20-cv-616-FtM-29MRM. Judge Sheri Polster Chappell no longer assigned to the case. (laf)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 This action and the following cases are TRANSFERRED to Senior United States District Judge John E. Steele with his consent: S.Y. v. Shivparvti, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-607-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Naples Garden Inn, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-610-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Sunstream Hotel & Resports, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-611-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Best Western Int'l, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-606-FtM-38MRM; S.Y. v. Marriott Int'l, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-627-FtM-38NPM; C.S. v. Naples Hotel Co., No. 2:20-cv-631-FtM-38MRM; S.Y. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-632-FtM-38NPM; C.S. v. Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-637-FtM-38MRM; and C.S. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-639-FtM-38NPM. The Clerk is DIRECTED to place a copy of this Order in each listed case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/24/2020. (AEH) (AEH).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/24/2020. (WRW)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Best Western International, Inc., R&M Real Estate Co Inc dba Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel, Robert Vocisano. (RMT)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-616-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by S. Y.. Related case(s): Yes (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Best Western International, Inc., R&M Real Estate Co Inc dba Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel, Robert Vocisano with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17200365) filed by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons All Defendants, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanlon, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.Y. v. Best Western International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Vocisano
Represented By: J. Michael Coleman
Represented By: Christyna M. Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&M Real Estate Co Inc dba Best Western Naples Plaza Hotel
Represented By: J. Michael Coleman
Represented By: Christyna M. Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Western International, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Represented By: Sharon M. Hanlon
Represented By: Diana Yastrovskaya
Represented By: Virginia E. Anello
Represented By: Brian J. Perkins
Represented By: Yale T. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?