Soto Guevara v. Gargiulo, Inc.
Plaintiff: MA ADRIANA SOTO GUEVARA
Defendant: Gargiulo, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00617
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:0704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 9/14/2020. (SMG)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Ma Adriana Soto Guevara (Pollock, Brian)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 08/21/2020 by Ma Adriana Soto Guevara as to Gargiulo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Gargiulo, Inc.)(Pollock, Brian)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/24/2020. (WRW)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Gargiulo, Inc. (RMT)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-617-FtM-66MRM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17200492) filed by MA ADRIANA SOTO GUEVARA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Pollock, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soto Guevara v. Gargiulo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MA ADRIANA SOTO GUEVARA
Represented By: Brian H. Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gargiulo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?