Sumnicht v. Thrive Senior Living, LLC
Plaintiff: Carrie Sumnicht
Defendant: THRIVE SENIOR LIVING, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00625
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Thrive Senior Living, LLC.(Cronan, Candace)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:40 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report and Pretrial & Discovery Plan by 11/27/2020.All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 20625. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Track 2 notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Thrive Senior Living, LLC. (Cronan, Candace)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By October 15, 2020, Thrive Senior Living, LLC will respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/24/2020. (brh)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Thrive Senior Living, LLC. (Cronan, Candace) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Thrive Senior Living, LLC of Defendant's Disclosure of Staff Counsel Status (Cronan, Candace)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Candace D. Cronan on behalf of Thrive Senior Living, LLC (Cronan, Candace)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Track 2 Notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Carrie Sumnicht. (Rothman, Bradley)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Track 2 notice and Corporate Disclosure Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Carrie Sumnicht. Related case(s): No (Rothman, Bradley)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2020. (WRW)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Thrive Senior Living, LLC. (drn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-625-FtM-66NPM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THRIVE SENIOR LIVING, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17201666) filed by Carrie Sumnicht. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Rothman, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sumnicht v. Thrive Senior Living, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THRIVE SENIOR LIVING, LLC
Represented By: Candace D. Cronan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Sumnicht
Represented By: Bradley Paul Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?