S.Y. v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc., CSM Corporation, Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC and CSM RI Naples, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00627
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of compliance re 29 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by S. Y. (Hanlon, Sharon)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Motion of Virginia E. Anello, Esq. for Special Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Virginia E. Anello to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must send only one required fee to the Clerk's Office for her special appearance in the first-filed Case No. 2:20-cv-118-JES-MRM. The Court hereby waives the required fee for special admission in connection with all other cases pending in the Fort Myers Division in which Virginia E. Anello is granted leave to appear specially for Plaintiffs S.Y. and/or C.S. This waiver does not apply to any other case in which Virginia E. Anello may seek leave to appear specially for any other party or in any other case pending in another Division. Additionally, given the unique procedural posture of this litigation--including the severance of the first-filed action, the resulting proliferation of separate cases, and the relatedness of the claims and defenses involved in each of the severed actions--the Court finds that Virginia E. Anello's appearance in each severed case brought on behalf of S.Y. and C.S. does not constitute the maintenance of a regular practice of law in Florida such that her special appearance should be denied. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Virginia E. Anello must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/16/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
October 15, 2020 Filing 28 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-627-FtM-29MRM. Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #27 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (laf)
October 15, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Virginia E. Anello to appear pro hac vice by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sample Order, #2 Exhibit B - Sample Order, #3 Exhibit C - Sample Order)(Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. By October 23, 2020, Plaintiff will file a response to CSM RI Naples, LLC and CSM Corporation's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/5/2020. (brh)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. By October 23, 2020, Plaintiff will file a response to Marriott International, Inc. and Residence Inn by Marriott LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #20). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/5/2020. (brh)
October 5, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by S. Y.. (Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 5, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by S. Y.. (Hanlon, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Track 2 notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by CSM Corporation, CSM RI Naples, LLC. (Olivo, Geraldo)
October 2, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE to counsel Virginia E. Anello of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
September 25, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re #1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Marriott International, Inc., Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Reagan, Amanda)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended #1 Complaint by CSM Corporation, CSM RI Naples, LLC, (Olivo, Geraldo) Modified on 9/28/2020 to amend docket text (MLS).
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 track 2 notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC. (Reagan, Amanda)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Track 2 notice and Corporate Disclosure Order by Marriott International, Inc.. (Reagan, Amanda) Modified on 9/14/2020 to amend docket text (MLS).
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. O'Day on behalf of Marriott International, Inc., Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC (O'Day, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Amended Appearance by Amanda Reagan on behalf of Marriott International, Inc., Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC (Reagan, Amanda)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. By September 25, 2020, Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC will respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/10/2020. (brh)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC. (Reagan, Amanda) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Reagan on behalf of Marriott International, Inc., Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC (Reagan, Amanda)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 09/02/2020 by S. Y. as to Marriott International, Inc.. (Hanlon, Sharon)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/01/2020 by CSM RI Naples, LLC as to CSM RI Naples, LLC. (Olivo, Geraldo)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 09/01/2020 by CSM Corporation as to CSM Corporation. (Olivo, Geraldo)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF of service by S. Y. as to Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC on 8/26/20 (Hanlon, Sharon) Modified on 8/28/2020 to amend docket text (MLS).
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2020. (WRW)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Judge John E. Steele. New case number: 2:20-cv-627-FtM-29NPM. Judge Sheri Polster Chappell no longer assigned to the case. (laf)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 This action and the following cases are TRANSFERRED to Senior United States District Judge John E. Steele with his consent: S.Y. v. Shivparvti, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-607-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Naples Garden Inn, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-610-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Sunstream Hotel & Resports, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-611-FtM-38NPM; S.Y. v. Best Western Int'l, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-616-FtM-38MRM; S.Y. v. Marriott Int'l, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-606-FtM-38NPM; C.S. v. Naples Hotel Co., No. 2:20-cv-631-FtM-38MRM; S.Y. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-632-FtM-38NPM; C.S. v. Jay Varahimata Investments, LLC, No. 2:20-cv-637-FtM-38MRM; and C.S. v. Wyndham Hotels & Resorts, Inc., No. 2:20-cv-639-FtM-38NPM. The Clerk is DIRECTED to place a copy of this Order in each listed case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/24/2020. (AEH) (AEH).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to CSM Corporation, CSM RI Naples, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC. (RMT)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-627-FtM-38NPM. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by S. Y.. Related case(s): Yes (Hanlon, Sharon)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSM Corporation, CSM RI Naples, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17201818) filed by S. Y.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons All Defendants)(Hanlon, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.Y. v. Marriott International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. O'Day
Represented By: Geraldo F. Olivo, III
Represented By: Amanda Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSM Corporation
Represented By: Geraldo F. Olivo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residence Inn by Marriott, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. O'Day
Represented By: Geraldo F. Olivo, III
Represented By: Amanda Reagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSM RI Naples, LLC
Represented By: Geraldo F. Olivo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Y.
Represented By: Sharon M. Hanlon
Represented By: Diana Yastrovskaya
Represented By: Virginia E. Anello
Represented By: Yale T. Freeman
Represented By: Brian J. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?