Sysak v. Nurse On Call, Inc.
Plaintiff: ANA SYSAK
Defendant: NURSE ON CALL, INC. D/B/A BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC. and Nurse On Call, Inc. a foreign profit corporation doing business as Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00643
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED: The Court is satisfied that Plaintiff's claims are subject to arbitration. The parties shall proceed to arbitration. This case is STAYED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to administratively close the file. The Court retains jurisdiction to adjudicate any necessary post-arbitration motions. The parties shall file a joint report no later than January 27, 2021 and every ninety days thereafter advising the Court of the progress of the arbitration. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 10/15/2020. (SMG)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Arbitration by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Arbitration Agreement)(Shebib, Abood)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Nurse On Call, Inc. D/B/A Brookdale Senior Living Inc. must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1) no later than 10/13/2020 because the deadline proposed in the motion is a federal holiday. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/14/2020. (McCoy, Mac)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Nurse On Call, Inc.. (Shebib, Abood) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ana Sysak. (Harne, Alexander)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ana Sysak. Related case(s): NO (Harne, Alexander)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2020. (WRW)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on 08/24/20 by Ana Sysak as to Nurse On Call, Inc.. (Harne, Alexander)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Nurse On Call, Inc. (drn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-643-FtM-66MRM. (SJB)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nurse On Call, Inc. d/b/a Brookdale Senior Living, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17206673) filed by Ana Sysak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Storch, Noah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sysak v. Nurse On Call, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE ON CALL, INC. D/B/A BROOKDALE SENIOR LIVING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse On Call, Inc. a foreign profit corporation doing business as Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.
Represented By: Abood Shebib
Represented By: Angelo Spinola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANA SYSAK
Represented By: Noah E. Storch
Represented By: Alexander Thomas Harne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?