Taylor v. U.S. Attorney General et al (Glades County - INS Detainee)
Petitioner: Terrance Taylor
Respondent: U.S Attorney General and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv00688
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus by Department of Homeland Security, U.S Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1A)(Spraker, Chad)
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFIED MAIL, RETURN RECEIPT (#7019 1640 0002 2628 6482) received as to Department of Homeland Security re #9 Order by Terrance Taylor (MLS)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Response to petition due by 10/16/2020. Petitioner has 21 days to reply to the petition response. The reply must not exceed 10 pages. Clerk is directed to serve the petition electronically to the United States Attorney's Office in Tampa, Florida and by certified mail to the United States Department of Homeland Security. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(SLU)
September 15, 2020 FEES paid by Terrance Taylor (Filing fee $5 receipt number FtM014833) (RMT)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSFER IN from the Southern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New Case Number: 2:20-cv-688-FtM-66MRM. (SLU)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/4/2020. (MLS)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER regarding Habeas Petition. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/4/2020. (MLS) Modified on 9/16/2020 to edit docket text (SLU).
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-23482. File received electronically
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Adopting #4 Report and Recommendations re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida and mark this case as CLOSED in this District. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) [Transferred from flsd on 9/4/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2241 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Terrance Taylor; Recommending that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida and the case be CLOSED by the Clerk of Court. Objections to R&R due by 9/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 9/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (br) [Transferred from flsd on 9/4/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrance Taylor. (daa) [Transferred from flsd on 9/4/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (daa) [Transferred from flsd on 9/4/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Terrance Taylor.(daa) [Transferred from flsd on 9/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. U.S. Attorney General et al (Glades County - INS Detainee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S Attorney General
Represented By: Chad C. Spraker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Chad C. Spraker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terrance Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?