Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. v. Laubenstein et al
Appellee: Paul Charles Laubenstein and Lisa Mary Laubenstein
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Clerk - Tampa, Honorable Caryl E. Delano and Bankruptcy Trustee
Appellant: Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00765
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief (Doc. #12). The Court grants a one-month extension rather than the two months requested. So Appellant must file its initial brief on or before December 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/16/2020. (KRH)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. for Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc... (O'Connor, Mark)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief by Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.. (O'Connor, Mark)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED: Appellant's Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark C. O'Connor (Doc. #7) is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to add Mark C. O'Connor to the service list.Unless already completed, on or before November 27, 2020, Mark C. O'Connor must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, on or before November 27, 2020, Mark C. O'Connor must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Failure to register may cause the Court to revoke permission to appear specially. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/13/2020. (AEH)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of compliance re #7 Unopposed MOTION for Mark C. O'Connor to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17513155 for $150 by Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. (Hall, M.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 Written designation and consent to act by M. Lewis Hall, III on behalf of Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.. Local Counsel: M. Lewis Hall, III. Non-Resident Counsel: Mark C. O'Connor. (Hall, M.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Mark C. O'Connor re: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Mark C. O'Connor to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17513155 for $150 by Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.. (Hall, M.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Mark C. O'Connor to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17513155 for $150 by Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.. (Hall, M.)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Lewis Hall, III on behalf of Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. (Hall, M.)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Track 1 notice and Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lisa Mary Laubenstein, Paul Charles Laubenstein. Related case(s): yes (Zinn, Brian)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on October 1, 2020. (MLS)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 2 Notice of Appeal, #2 3 Order on Appeal, #3 4 Statement of Issues, #4 5 Appellant Designation, #5 6 Appellee Designation, #6 7 Public Docket, #7 9-20-ap-0504_Docket_000001_Complaint_by_Pilgrim_Skating_Arena_inc_against_Paul_Charles_Laubenstein_Lisa_Mary_Laube, #8 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000032_Part_1_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay, #9 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000032_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #10 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000036_Response_to_Motion_for_Relief_from_the_Automatic_Stay_Filed_by_Brian_D_Zinn_on_behalf_of, #11 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000044_Part_1_Reply_To_Debtors_Opposition_to_Motion_for_Relief_from_Automatic_Stay_to_Continue_Pending, #12 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000044_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #13 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000044_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #14 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000044_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #15 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000049_Objection_to_Claim, #16 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000050_Response_to_Reply_to_Debtors_Opposition_to_Motion_for_Relief_from_the_Automatic_Stay_to_Co, #17 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000053_Response_to_Debtors_Objection_to_Claim_No_16_of_Pilgrim_Skating_Arena_Filed_by_Mark_C_OC, #18 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000054_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions_of_Homestead_by_Pilgrim_Skating_Arena_Contains, #19 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000057_Notice_of_2004_Examination_of_Bean_Hatzis__Associates_Inc, #20 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000062_Response_to_Response_of_Pilgrim_Skating_Arena_Inc_to_Debtors_Objection_to_Proof_of_Claim, #21 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000063_Response_to_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Homestead_Exemption_on_Behalf_of_Unsecured_Credi, #22 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000074_Order_Abating_Objection_to_Claim, #23 9-20-bk-3697_Docket_000076_Order_Overruling_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions)(JN)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASES ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/7/2020. (jmc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. (Attachments: #1 transmittal)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. v. Laubenstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Paul Charles Laubenstein
Represented By: Brian David Zinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lisa Mary Laubenstein
Represented By: Brian David Zinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Clerk - Tampa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Honorable Caryl E. Delano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C. O'Connor
Represented By: M. Lewis Hall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?