Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. v. Laubenstein et al
Appellee: Lisa Mary Laubenstein and Paul Charles Laubenstein
Appellant: Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. and Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00804
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: Appellant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file their initial brief, #13, is GRANTED. Appellant shall file their initial brief no later than 12/22/2020. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 11/13/2020. (VK)
November 11, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.. (O'Connor, Mark)
November 11, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief by Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.. (O'Connor, Mark)
November 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of compliance re #11 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. (Hall, M.)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney O'Connor is directed to file the appropriate forms, pay the requisite filing fees, and participate in electronic filing by registering for CM/ECF and obtaining passwords within twenty days of this Order. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 11/6/2020. (SMG)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 Written designation and consent to act by M. Lewis Hall, III on behalf of Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.. Local Counsel: M. Lewis Hall, III. Non-Resident Counsel: Mark C. O'Connor. (Hall, M.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Mark C. O'Connor re: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Mark C. O'Connor to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17512503 for $150 by Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.. (Hall, M.)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Mark C. O'Connor to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17512503 for $150 by Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.. (Hall, M.)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lisa Mary Laubenstein, Paul Charles Laubenstein. Related case(s): yes (Zinn, Brian)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 10/20/20. (drn)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Mark C. O'Connor of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (drn)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Hearing held on 9/24/20 before Judge Caryl E. Delano re #3 Bankruptcy Record. (drn)
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 2 Notice of Appeal, #2 3 Order on Appeal, #3 4 Statement of Issues, #4 5 Appellant Designation, #5 6 Appellee Designation, #6 7 Docket, #7 9-20-bk-03697_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_13, #8 9-20-bk-03697_Docket_000027_First_Amended_Summary_of_Assets__First_Amended_Schedule_ISchedule_J_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid, #9 9-20-bk-03697_Docket_000054_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions_of_Homestead_by_Pilgrim_Skating_Arena_Contains, #10 9-20-bk-03697_Docket_000059_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions_of_Homestead_by, #11 9-20-bk-03697_Docket_000063_Response_to_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Homestead_Exemption_on_Behalf_of_Unsecured_Credi)(JN)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/15/2020. (WRW)
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. (Attachments: #1 transmittal)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc. v. Laubenstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lisa Mary Laubenstein
Represented By: Brian David Zinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Paul Charles Laubenstein
Represented By: Brian David Zinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Creditor, Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pilgrim Skating Arena, Inc.
Represented By: Mark C. O'Connor
Represented By: M. Lewis Hall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?