Mohring v. Speedway, LLC.
Plaintiff: Kurt Mohring
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC. and Speedway, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00912
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of compliance re #8 FLSA scheduling order by Speedway, LLC (Blanco Garcia, Rocio)
December 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rocio Blanco Garcia on behalf of Speedway, LLC (Blanco Garcia, Rocio)
December 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. See order for Court deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/13/2020. (AEH)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Speedway, LLC. (Jones, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #1) no later than 1/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/8/2020. (CM)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Speedway, LLC. (Jones, Jeffrey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/23/2020. (WRW)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Speedway, LLC. (drn)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-912-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT KURT MOHRING against SPEEDWAY, LLC. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17563422) filed by Kurt Mohring. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Ventura, Chanelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohring v. Speedway, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Bernard Jones
Represented By: Rocio Blanco Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Mohring
Represented By: Chanelle Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?