Cunningham v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Patricia Cunningham
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00913
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 US Marshal 285 form for service via U.S. Certified Mail as to Commissioner of Social Security. (drn)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 US Marshal 285 form for service via U.S. Certified Mail as to U.S. Attorney. (drn)
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by Patricia Cunningham. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/17/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (LYB)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MLS)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Track 1 notice Related case order and per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Patricia Cunningham. Related case(s): no (Avard, Carol)
November 23, 2020 Filing 7 TRACK ONE NOTICE AND RELATED CASE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/23/2020. (WRW)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER in re: courtesy paper copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 7/19/19. (drn)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (drn)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to file all pleadings in this cause without prepayment of fees or costs. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to prepare and forward the completed service documents along with sufficient copies of the Complaint to the Clerk for service by the United States Marshals Service. Upon receipt of appropriate instructions in proper form from the Clerk, the United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process without prepayment of fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/18/2020. (brh)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-913-FtM-38NPM. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (SJB)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Patricia Cunningham. (Avard, Carol)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Patricia Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Cunningham
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Represented By: Mark V. Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?