Hastings v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: David S. Hastings
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv00951
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER By March 15, 2021, Plaintiff must file a waiver by Defendant or proof of service. If Plaintiff fails to provide proof of waiver or service or fails to show good cause for his failure to effect service within the time allotted, the Court may dismiss the case without further notice. The Clerk shall provide Plaintiff with a copy of the Court's "Guide for Proceeding Without a Lawyer" and forms necessary to effect service. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/6/2021. (SLU)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Bank National Association c/o Registered Agent Corporation Service Company. (Attachments: #1 Consent Letter and Forms)(SLU)
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank National Association filed by David S. Hastings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT for damages (Signed) against U.S. Bank National Association filed by David S. Hastings. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER striking #1 Complaint filed by David S. Hastings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to strike and return the unsigned Complaint (Doc. 1) to Plaintiff. On or before December 31, 2020, Plaintiff must file a signed complaint. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/11/2020. (LYB)
December 10, 2020 FEES paid by David S. Hastings (Filing fee $400 receipt number FtM015003) (RMT) Approval given by Finance to accept payment as is. Modified on 12/10/2020 (RMT).
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/7/2020. (LYB)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for Incarcerated Pro Se Plaintiffs. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/7/2020. (LYB)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 (UNSIGNED) COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank National Association with Jury Demand filed by David S. Hastings. (Attachment(s): #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Mailing Envelope)(no fee/ifp; no service copy) (LYB). Modified images on 12/9/2020 (LYB). Modified on 12/11/2020. Pleading stricken per Order #4 (drn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hastings v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David S. Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?