Wainey v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Wainey
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00969
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1396
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL ACTION ORDER. See order for Court deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Judge John Badalamenti, Judge John E. Steele, Judge Mac R. McCoy and Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 2/3/2021.(AEH)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 1/8/21 by Deborah A. Wainey as to United States of America. (Avard, Carol)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/28/2020. (jmc)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America. (RMT)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Deborah A. Wainey. (Mohney, Douglas)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-969-FtM-38NPM. (SJB)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17649535) filed by Deborah A. Wainey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Form 95, #3 Exhibit Form 95 acknowledgment, #4 Exhibit Form 95 inquiry, #5 Proposed Summons)(Mohney, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wainey v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah A. Wainey
Represented By: Douglas D. Mohney
Represented By: Michael G. Sexton
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?