Runway Farms, LLC v. Oakes Farms, Inc.
Plaintiff: Runway Farms, LLC
Defendant: Oakes Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00979
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Civil Action Order by Oakes Farms, Inc.. (Bracci, Steven)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Civil Action Order by Runway Farms, LLC. (Esquivel, Katy)
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 01/15/2021 by Runway Farms, LLC as to Oakes Farms, Inc.. (Esquivel, Katy)
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must file a joint Case Management Report on the approved forms for each no later than 3/22/2021. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report are filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re #1 Complaint or Alternatively, for More Particular Statement, by Oakes Farms, Inc.. (Bracci, Steven)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL ACTION ORDER. See order for Court deadlines and directives. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Judge John Badalamenti, Judge John E. Steele, Judge Mac R. McCoy and Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 2/3/2021.(AEH)
December 16, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Runway Farms, LLC. (Esquivel, Katy)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/16/2020. (WRW)
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Oakes Farms, Inc. (RMT)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Runway Farms, LLC. (Esquivel, Katy)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:20-cv-979-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oakes Farms, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17667197) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Grower Agreement, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Esquivel, Katy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runway Farms, LLC v. Oakes Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Runway Farms, LLC
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakes Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Bracci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?