Vargas v. United States of America
Petitioner: Gorge Antonio Vargas
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00067
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing United States of America to respond to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 2:15-cr-115-FtM-38MRM. Response due by 4/27/2021. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/28/2021. (LYB)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/27/2021. (MLS)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 2:15-cr-115-FtM-38MRM filed by Gorge Antonio Vargas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gorge Antonio Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Robert P. Barclift
Represented By: Charles D. Schmitz
Represented By: Jesus M. Casas
Represented By: Simon R. Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?