Cataudella v. Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Cataudella
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club and Ken Lord
Case Number: 2:2021cv00077
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/23/2021. (jmc)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING TELEPHONIC PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/23/2021. (jmc)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 4/21/2021. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 First MOTION to Remand to State Court and INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Sam's East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Ken Lord, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Opinion and Order Remand)(Tanner, Madison)
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of compliance by Vincent Cataudella (Hale, Patrick)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 First MOTION to Remand to State Court and incorporated Memorandum of Law by Vincent Cataudella. (Iyampillai, Patrick) (Attachment(s) #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (MLS).
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Patrick Michael Hale of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ken Lord, Sam's East, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed (in State Court 12/29/20) by Vincent Cataudella.(MLS)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0077-FtM-66MRM. (SJB)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlotte County Circuit Court, case number 20-891-CA filed in State Court on 10/08/2020. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 113A-17821596 filed by Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A - Pltf's Amd Complaint, #2 State Court Other Documents Exhibit B - Agreed Order on Pltf's 1st Motion to Amend, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit C - Pltf's RRFA, #4 State Court Other Documents Exhibit D - State Court Pleadings, #5 State Court Other Documents Exhibit E - Pltf's Ans. to ROGS, redacted, #6 Civil Cover Sheet (Tanner, Madison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cataudella v. Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Cataudella
Represented By: Patrick Arun Iyampillai
Represented By: Patrick Michael Hale
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Call
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Amanda J. Sharkey Ross
Represented By: Madison Allen Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?