Richards v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Petitioner: Amon Richards
Respondent: CHELLIE BAKER, NORWOOD, J. Jackson, HEREDIA, T. Gjerde, QUESADA, D UELLENBERG, WILLIAMS, Office of the Inspector General and Florida Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2021cv00134
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
Presiding Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 TRANSFER IN from the Northern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New Case Number: 2:21-cv-134-JES-NPM. (LMF)
February 19, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00058. File received electronically
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The report and recommendation is accepted and adopted, over Plaintiff's objections, as this Court's opinion. This case shall be transferred to the Fort Myers Division of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. Plaintiffs Motion in Opposition of Removal of Case, construed as a motion to remand, ECF No. 7, is DENIED. The Clerk shall terminate, for purposes of this Courts docket, Defendants pending Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #5, and Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants, ECF No. #9. These motions remain pending upon transfer to the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk shall take all steps necessary to effect the transfer and close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 02/19/2021. (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
February 18, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #10 Objection to Report and Recommendations (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by AMON RICHARDS. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS by AMON RICHARDS. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by OMAR JOSE FAMADA on behalf of HEREDIA (FAMADA, OMAR) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION IN OPPOSITION OF REMOVAL OF CASE TO FEDERAL COURT by AMON RICHARDS. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by OMAR JOSE FAMADA on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL (FAMADA, OMAR) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by J JACKSON, D UELLENBERG. (GLINTON, VAUGHN) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Notice of Removal. For the reasons set forth above, the undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS that: This case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 3/3/2021.) The clerk of court close this case file. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 2/3/2021. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
January 29, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #2 Notice of Removal. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to VAUGHN G. S. GLINTON, JR. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by D Uellenberg, Jenice Jackson, Williams from SECOND JUDICIAL CIRCUIT IN AND FOR LEON COUNTY, case number 2020CA1896., filed by D Uellenberg, Jenice Jackson, Williams. (rcb) #1 Exhibit TORT COMPLAINT (Second Judicial Circuit Complaint) #2 Exhibit NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (rcb). Modified to replaced Exhibit 1-Second Judicial Circuit Complaint on 1/29/2021 (rcb). [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: TO: ATTORNEY FRANCIS H SHEPPARD Further, for future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (rcb) [Transferred from flnd on 2/19/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHELLIE BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NORWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J. Jackson
Represented By: Francis H. Sheppard
Represented By: VAUGHN GLINTON, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: HEREDIA
Represented By: Omar J Famada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T. Gjerde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: QUESADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D UELLENBERG
Represented By: Francis H. Sheppard
Represented By: VAUGHN GLINTON, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAMS
Represented By: Francis H. Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Office of the Inspector General
Represented By: Omar J Famada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Florida Department of Corrections
Represented By: Omar J Famada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amon Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?