2826 Cleveland Avenue Operations, LLC v. 1199SEIU, United Healthcare Workers East, Florida Region
Plaintiff: 2826 Cleveland Avenue Operations, LLC doing business as Heritage Park Rehabilitation and Healthcare
Defendant: 1199SEIU, United Healthcare Workers East, Florida Region
Case Number: 2:2021cv00245
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF of service on 4/21/21 as to 1199SEIU, United Healthcare Workers East by 2826 Cleveland Avenue Operations, LLC (Datz, Laura) Modified on 5/14/2021 to reflect counsel notified as to use of full case number (MLS).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on sua sponte review of the file. It appears Defendant has been served. Yet Plaintiff has not filed a proof of service of the summons and complaint per Local Rule 1.10(a). Accordingly, on or before May 17, 2021, Plaintiff must show cause why it has not filed a proof of service. Alternatively, Plaintiff can file a proof of service by that date. Failure to comply will result is dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. See M.D. Fla. L. R. 1.10(d). Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/14/2021. (KRH)
May 11, 2021 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Datz, Laura) Modified on 5/11/2021 to reflect counsel notified as to use of full case number (MLS).
April 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call.Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 6/1/2021. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #4 Civil Action Order by 1199SEIU, United Healthcare Workers East, Florida Region. (Oliva-Van Horsten, Holly)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Phillips on behalf of 1199SEIU, United Healthcare Workers East, Florida Region (Phillips, Kathleen)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Ellen Oliva-Van Horsten on behalf of 1199SEIU, United Healthcare Workers East, Florida Region (Oliva-Van Horsten, Holly)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Consented and Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw Meghan Colleen McDonough as Counsel of Record. The Court finds good cause to grant this motion because Plaintiff is still represented by counsel. Accordingly, Meghan Colleen McDonough has no further responsibility in this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Meghan Colleen McDonough as counsel of record and remove her from the CM/ECF electronic service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/5/2021. (WJF)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Meghan Colleen McDonough to Withdraw as Attorney by 2826 Cleveland Avenue Operations, LLC. (McDonough, Meghan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Action Order by 2826 Cleveland Avenue Operations, LLC. (Datz, Laura) Modified on 3/24/2021 to reflect counsel notified of use of full case number and attorney information (MLS).
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLS)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/22/2021. (MLS)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to 1199SEIU, United Healthcare Workers East, Florida Region. (MLS)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0245-SPC-MRM. (SJB)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2826 Cleveland Avenue Operations, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-18028572) filed by 2826 Cleveland Avenue Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Datz, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2826 Cleveland Avenue Operations, LLC v. 1199SEIU, United Healthcare Workers East, Florida Region
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1199SEIU, United Healthcare Workers East, Florida Region
Represented By: Kathleen M. Phillips
Represented By: Holly Ellen Oliva-Van Horsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2826 Cleveland Avenue Operations, LLC doing business as Heritage Park Rehabilitation and Healthcare
Represented By: Meghan Colleen McDonough
Represented By: Laura Datz
Represented By: Jennie Lynn Colabelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?