Peters v. Woods
Plaintiff: Edward Peters
Defendant: Lisa I Woods
Case Number: 2:2021cv00468
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of #8 Motion to Dismiss by Lisa I Woods. (Widom, Mitchell)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Edward Peters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Edward Peters)(Bermudez, Victor)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 8/23/2021. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 21468. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
July 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Lisa I Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Declaration of Lisa I. Woods)(Widom, Mitchell)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF of service by Edward Peters as to Lisa Woods on 6/23/21 (Bermudez, Victor)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Civil Action Order by Edward Peters. (Bermudez, Victor)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLS)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/21/2021. (MLS)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Lisa I Woods. (MLS)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0468-JLB-NPM. (SJB)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lisa I Woods with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18379305) filed by Edward Peters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint 1 Edward B Grimes Living Trust, #2 Exhibit Complaint 2 Esther G Grimes Living Trust, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons for Lisa I Woods)(Bermudez, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Peters
Represented By: Victor Bermudez
Represented By: Kelsey Hazzard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa I Woods
Represented By: Mitchell Edward Widom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?