Mitar v. United States of America
Plaintiff: GEORGE JOHN MITAR, III
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00490
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 08/03/2021 by George John Mitar, III as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Mitar, George)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF of service by George John Mitar, III (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Mitar, George)
July 18, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF of service by George John Mitar, III, CERTIFICATE of service by George John Mitar, III . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service)(Mitar, George)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/30/2021. (RMT)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMT)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to United States of America. (RMT)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-490-JLB-MRM. (LRB)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18421027) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Mitar, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitar v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE JOHN MITAR, III
Represented By: George J. Mitar, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?