Alexander Produce Inc. et al v. DGR Sales, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Produce Inc. and C&B Farms, Inc
Defendant: DAMON W. TRAWICK and DGR SALES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00495
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerk's Default against All Defendants by Alexander Produce Inc., C&B Farms, Inc. (Barmat, Marc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on JULY 12, 2021 by Alexander Produce Inc., C&B Farms, Inc as to DGR Sales, LLC, Damon W. Trawick. (Barmat, Marc)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Civil Action Order by Alexander Produce Inc., C&B Farms, Inc. (Barmat, Marc)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to DGR Sales, LLC, Damon W. Trawick. (MLS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/2/2021. (MLS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-495-JLB-MRM. (LRB)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Damon W. Trawick, DGR Sales, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18432494) filed by Alexander Produce Inc., C&B Farms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-Alexander Decision & Order, #3 Exhibit 2-C&B Decision and Order, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Barmat, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander Produce Inc. et al v. DGR Sales, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAMON W. TRAWICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DGR SALES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Produce Inc.
Represented By: Marc P. Barmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C&B Farms, Inc
Represented By: Marc P. Barmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?