Adkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Steven Adkins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2021cv00718
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Jeffrey Steven Adkins (Berger, Erik)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Jeffrey Steven Adkins (Berger, Erik)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Jeffrey Steven Adkins. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Berger, Erik)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (jmc)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JK)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/29/2021. (JK)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0718-SPC-NPM. (LMW)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Jeffrey Steven Adkins. Related case(s): No (Berger, Erik)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jeffrey Steven Adkins. (Berger, Erik)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18757510) filed by Jeffrey Steven Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Berger, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Steven Adkins
Represented By: Erik William Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?