Laster v. United States of America
Defendant: United States of America
Petitioner: Brown Laster, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00735
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Amended Petition and Memorandum of Law in Support of 2255 Petition by Brown Laster, Jr. (Reese, Rachael) Modified as to docket text on 11/10/2021 (JK).
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Amended Petition (Doc. #9) for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/28/2021. (NMC)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document: Amended Petition and Memorandum of Law in Support of 2255 Petition by Brown Laster, Jr. (Reese, Rachael) Modified as to docket text on 10/27/2021 (JK).
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Civil Action Order by Brown Laster, Jr. (Reese, Rachael)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Brown Laster, Jr. Related case(s): Yes (Reese, Rachael)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing United States of America to respond to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 2:16-cr-81. The response is due by 1/18/2022. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition)(KLM)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Michael Baeza on behalf of United States of America (Baeza, Daniel)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255 Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/18/2021. (JK)
October 18, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order for Confined Plaintiff Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/18/2021. (JK)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0735-SPC-MRM. (SJB)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 2:16-cr-81 filed by Brown Laster, Jr.(Reese, Rachael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laster v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brown Laster, Jr.
Represented By: Rachael Elizabeth Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel Michael Baeza
Represented By: Michael V. Leeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?