McKesson Global Sourcing Limited v. M.C. Johnson Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: MCKESSON GLOBAL SOURCING LIMITED
Defendant: M.C. JOHNSON CO., INC. doing business as PRIVATE LABEL MEDICAL also known as M.C. JOHNSON COMPANY, INC., M.C. JOHNSON COMPANY, INC. and M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. a Florida profit corporation doing business as Private Label Medical also known as M.C. Johnson Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00782
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Uniform Case Management Report - [PROPOSED] Stipulated Protective Order)(Davies, Joanne)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. (Knipe, Asher) Modified as to docket text and to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 12/22/2021 (JK).
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Count 1 of the Amended Complaint by M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. (Duffy, Robert
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint against M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. filed by McKesson Global Sourcing Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to FAC, #2 Exhibit 2 to FAC, #3 Exhibit 3 to FAC, #4 Exhibit 4 to FAC, #5 Exhibit 5 to FAC, #6 Exhibit 6 to FAC, #7 Exhibit 7 to FAC)(Davies, Joanne) Modified as to docket text on 12/10/2021 (JK).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file an amended complaint. Defendant need not respond to the original complaint. Instead, by December 10, 2021, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, and Defendant will respond to it within ten days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/3/2021. (SM)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by McKesson Global Sourcing Limited. (Davies, Joanne) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Robert M. Duffy on behalf of M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. Lead Counsel: Robert M. Duffy (Duffy, Robert) Modified as to docket text and to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on all filings on 11/24/2021 (JK).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Joanne N Davies on behalf of McKesson Global Sourcing Limited. Lead Counsel: Joanne N. Davies. (Davies, Joanne)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 10:20 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 12/27/2021. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 21782. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 unopposed motion for special admission of Robert M. Duffy. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/18/2021. (SM)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. By December 2, 2021, Defendant will respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/17/2021. (SM)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Robert M. Duffy to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18940033 for $150 by M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. (Knipe, Asher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 11/18/2021 (JK).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. (Knipe, Asher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 11/18/2021 (JK).
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Asher Knipe on behalf of M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. (Knipe, Asher) Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 11/18/2021 (JK).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Special Admission of Joanne N. Davies. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/16/2021. (SM)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on October 27, 2021 by McKesson Global Sourcing Limited as to M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. (Goldstein, Jason)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Joanne N. Davies to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18878127 for $150 by McKesson Global Sourcing Limited. (Goldstein, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. (JK)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/26/2021. (JK)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0782-JES-NPM. (SJB)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by McKesson Global Sourcing Limited. (Goldstein, Jason) Modified on 10/26/2021 (JK).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18855369) filed by McKesson Global Sourcing Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Goldstein, Jason) Modified as to docket text on 10/26/2021 (JK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKesson Global Sourcing Limited v. M.C. Johnson Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C. JOHNSON CO., INC. doing business as PRIVATE LABEL MEDICAL also known as M.C. JOHNSON COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C. JOHNSON COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Robert M. Duffy
Represented By: Asher Knipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C. Johnson Co., Inc. a Florida profit corporation doing business as Private Label Medical also known as M.C. Johnson Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Duffy
Represented By: Asher Knipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCKESSON GLOBAL SOURCING LIMITED
Represented By: Jason Edward Goldstein
Represented By: Joanne N Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?