Roster v. Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Janet Roster
Defendant: Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00806
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Aristides Diaz on behalf of Janet Roster. Lead Counsel: Aristides "Kico" Diaz (Diaz, Aristides)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Mandatory Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 1/4/2022; Motions to Add or Join Parties or Amend Pleadings due by 3/7/2022; Plaintiff Disclosure of any Expert Report due by 10/31/2022; Defendant Disclosure of any Expert Report due by 12/1/2022; Rebuttal of Expert Report due by 1/3/2023; Discovery and Motions to Compel Discovery due by 1/31/2023; Conduct Mediation hearing by 2/14/2023 (Lead counsel to coordinate dates); Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 3/28/2023; Final Pretrial Meeting by 7/28/2023; Motions in Limine due by 8/4/2023; Joint Final Pretrial Statement due by 8/11/2023; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2023 at 1:30 PM before Judge John L. Badalamenti; and Jury Trial Term set for 9/5/2023 before Judge John L. Badalamenti. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/28/2021. (FN)
December 28, 2021 Filing 22 Minute Entry for Telephonic Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy: granting 21 ORAL Motion by Plantiff to File Designation of Lead Counsel of Record by 1/7/2022. PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 12/28/2021. (Digital) (FN)
December 28, 2021 Filing 21 ORAL MOTION by Plaintiff to File Designation of Lead Counsel of Record by 1/7/2022. (FN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
December 13, 2021 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Marsh, Kristina)
November 12, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement #4 by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Geovera Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate GeoVera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc., Other Affiliate GeoVera Insurance Company for Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. (Marsh, Kristina)
November 12, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Marsh, Kristina)
November 12, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kristina Lynn Marsh on behalf of Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Kristina L. Marsh. (Marsh, Kristina)
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses re #10 to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses - Roster v GeoVera)(Marsh, Kristina) Modified as to docket text and entry relationship on 11/15/2021 (JK).
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Janet Roster. Related case(s): Yes (Diaz, Aristides)
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Janet Roster. (Diaz, Aristides)
November 8, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Answer to Complaint by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Geovera Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent GeoVera Advantage Insurance Services, Inc., Corporate Parent GeoVera Insurance Company for Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. (Marsh, Kristina)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Marsh, Kristina)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kristina Lynn Marsh on behalf of Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Kristina L. Marsh. (Marsh, Kristina)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses - Policy - Roster v. GeoVera)(Marsh, Kristina) Modified on 11/8/2021 to update docket text(jmc).
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Governing Telephonic Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 11/3/2021. (FN)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 11/3/2021. (FN)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of hearing: TELEPHONIC Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 12/15/2021. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held. (FN)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Christina M. Flores and Kristina Lynn Marsh of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (jmc)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (jmc)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/2/2021. (jmc)
November 2, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Geovera Specialty Insurance Company with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number AFLMDC-18877866 filed by Janet Roster. Filed in State Court on 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jmc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-0806-JLB-MRM. (SJB)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlotte County Circuit Court, case number 21001052CA filed in State Court on 09/15/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-18877866 filed by Geovera Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal - Affidavit of Adam Marchant, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit of Adam Marchant, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal - Affidavit of Probable Cause, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal - Mortgage Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal - Voter Information Lookup, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Notice of Removal - Citation, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Notice of Removal - Complaint with Exhibits, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Notice of Removal - SPOL, #9 State Court COMPLAINT Complaint with Exhibits, #10 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #11 State Court Other Documents, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marsh, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roster v. Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Roster
Represented By: Aristides J. Diaz
Represented By: Aristides Diaz
Represented By: Jalitza Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geovera Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristina Lynn Marsh
Represented By: Christina M. Flores
Represented By: Justine Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?