Blevins v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Plaintiff: James Blevins
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. and Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.)
Case Number: 2:2021cv00887
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 4 E before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 4/11/2022. (WRW)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot #8 plaintiff's motion to approve alternative method of service of process. See order for details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/26/2022. (SM)
January 25, 2022 Filing 17 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/25/2022. (DIGITAL) (WRW)
January 13, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by James Blevins. (Doyle, James)
January 11, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Status Conference previously scheduled for 1/18/2022 is rescheduled to 1/25/2022 at 09:30 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. An Amended Zoom invitation will be sent. (WRW)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's motion to continue status conference. The status conference will be reset by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/11/2022. (SM)
January 11, 2022 Filing 13 First MOTION to Continue by James Blevins. (Doyle, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.) (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 7, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of hearing: Status Conference set for 1/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. The Courtroom Deputy will transmit instructions for joining the video conference by separate email to the required participants. (WRW)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Approve Alternative Method of Service of Process. The Court will hold a status conference, which will be set by separate notice. The Clerk is directed to unseal the motion. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/7/2022. (SM)
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by James Blevins. Related case(s): Yes (Doyle, James)
December 9, 2021 Filing 8 First MOTION for Alternative Service by James Blevins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Ruling by Judge Ruiz, #2 Exhibit B: Affidavit of Celeste Ingalls, #3 Exhibit C: IMA Article, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Doyle, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. (JK)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Knauf Gips KG. (JK)
November 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
November 30, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/30/2021. (JK)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0887-JLB-NPM. (SJB)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd. with Jury Demand filed by James Blevins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Knauf Gips KG, #3 Proposed Summons Knauf Platerboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.)(Doyle, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blevins v. Knauf Gips KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Blevins
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf New Building System (Tianjin) Co. Ltd (f/k/a Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.)
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael Ryan Dodson
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?