Oil Com Uganda et al v. Wessel Van Tonder
Plaintiff: OIL COM UGANDA, ISLAM EDHA ABDAHAH NAHDI and Islam Edha Abdallah Nahdi
Defendant: ESTATE OF BRUWER WESSEL VAN TONDER
Case Number: 2:2021cv00916
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Estate of Bruwer Wessel Van Tonder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A")(Sanchez, Alvaro)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #5 Amended Complaint by Estate of Bruwer Wessel Van Tonder.(Sanchez, Alvaro)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE to counsel Alvaro Carlos Sanchez of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 3/8/2022. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 21916. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of filing Corrected Verification Page by Islam Edha Abdahah Nahdi, Oil Com Uganda re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Billoo, Yasir) Modified on 1/26/2022, tp add docket title text. (SPB)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Islam Edha Abdahah Nahdi, Oil Com Uganda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit)(Billoo, Yasir)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/24/2022 by Estate of Bruwer Wessel Van Tonder as to Estate of Bruwer Wessel Van Tonder. (Culhane, Timothy)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Estate of Bruwer Wessel Van Tonder. (JK)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Islam Edha Abdahah Nahdi, Oil Com Uganda. (Billoo, Yasir)
December 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Estate of Bruwer Wessel Van Tonder filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Islam Edha Abdahah Nahdi, Oil Com Uganda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Billoo, Yasir)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (jmc)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/9/2021. (jmc)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:21-cv-0916-JES-NPM. (SJB)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oil Com Uganda, Islam Edha Abdahah Nahdi (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19003245) filed by Oil Com Uganda, Islam Edha Abdahah Nahdi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit (Refiled as 16), #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Billoo, Yasir) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2021: #16 Exhibit) (jmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oil Com Uganda et al v. Wessel Van Tonder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OIL COM UGANDA
Represented By: Yasir Billoo
Represented By: Karen Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISLAM EDHA ABDAHAH NAHDI
Represented By: Yasir Billoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Islam Edha Abdallah Nahdi
Represented By: Yasir Billoo
Represented By: Karen Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESTATE OF BRUWER WESSEL VAN TONDER
Represented By: Alvaro Carlos Sanchez
Represented By: David William Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?