Kay v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al
Petitioner: Robert Cline Kay
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections and Florida Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2022cv00042
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiersten Elizabeth Jensen on behalf of Secretary, Department of Corrections (Jensen, Kiersten)
February 9, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #2 Civil Action Order by Robert Cline Kay. (SPB)
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Robert Cline Kay. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SPB)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. The Response to the petition is due by 5/9/2022. Petitioner has 30 days to reply to the petition response. The Clerk is directed to serve the petition. If applicable, the Clerk is directed to dismiss all named Respondents except for the Secretary of the Florida Department of Corrections and terminate them from the file. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 2/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(KLM)
February 4, 2022 FEES paid by Robert Cline Kay (Filing fee $5.00 receipt number FTM015669) (JK)
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/27/2022. (SPB)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL Action Order for Confined Plaintiff Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/27/2022. (SPB)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert Cline Kay. (No fees paid) (HAI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kay v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Cline Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Represented By: Kiersten Elizabeth Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Florida Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?