Sanchez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gloria E. Sanchez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2022cv00142
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff memorandum due by 6/28/2022 and Defendant memorandum due by 8/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/29/2022. (FN)
April 29, 2022 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
April 29, 2022 Filing 9 SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re #7 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix, #14 Appendix, #15 Appendix, #16 Appendix, #17 Appendix, #18 Appendix, #19 Appendix, #20 Appendix, #21 Appendix)(Rudy, John)
April 29, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Commissioner of Social Security that the parties DO NOT CONSENT to Magistrate Judge (Rudy, John)
April 29, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John)
March 10, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/10/2022. (SPB)
March 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (SPB)
March 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0142-JLB-MRM. (SJB)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Gloria E. Sanchez identifying Other Affiliate Bill B. Berke, Other Affiliate David F Chermol, Other Affiliate Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region IV, Other Affiliate United States Attorney's Office, Middle District of Florida, Other Affiliate Attorney General of USA, Other Affiliate Karen L Nixon for Gloria E. Sanchez.. (Berke, Bill)
March 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19302429) filed by Gloria E. Sanchez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons OGC, #3 Proposed Summons USAG, #4 Proposed Summons USAO)(Berke, Bill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria E. Sanchez
Represented By: Bill B. Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?