Martin v. Commisssioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Megan Martin
Defendant: Commisssioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2022cv00224
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff memorandum due by 8/2/2022 and Defendant memorandum due by 10/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/3/2022. (FN)
June 3, 2022 Filing 11 SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re #8 Answer to Complaint by Commisssioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix, #8 Appendix, #9 Appendix, #10 Appendix, #11 Appendix, #12 Appendix, #13 Appendix, #14 Appendix, #15 Appendix, #16 Appendix, #17 Appendix, #18 Appendix, #19 Appendix, #20 Appendix, #21 Appendix, #22 Appendix, #23 Appendix, #24 Appendix, #25 Appendix, #26 Appendix, #27 Appendix, #28 Appendix, #29 Appendix)(Rudy, John)
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commisssioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE by Commisssioner of Social Security that the parties DO NOT CONSENT to Magistrate Judge (Rudy, John)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commisssioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John)
April 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Megan Martin. Related case(s): No (Avard, Carol)
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Civil Action Order by Megan Martin. (Avard, Carol)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/11/2022. (SPB)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (SPB)
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commisssioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0224-JLB-MRM. (SJB)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commisssioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-19433505) filed by Megan Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Commisssioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Martin
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Represented By: Mark V. Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commisssioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?