Severance v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rodney Wade Severance
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2022cv00227
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff memorandum due by 8/5/2022 and Defendant memorandum due by 10/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/6/2022. (FN)
June 6, 2022 Filing 13 SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re #10 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Appendix, #5 Appendix, #6 Appendix, #7 Appendix)(Rudy, John)
June 6, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John)
June 6, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE by Commissioner of Social Security that the parties DO NOT CONSENT to Magistrate Judge (Rudy, John)
June 6, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John)
April 13, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Rodney Wade Severance. Related case(s): No (Avard, Carol)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Civil Action Order by Rodney Wade Severance. (Avard, Carol)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form), construed as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis under 28 U.S.C. 1915 and M.D. Fla. R. 6.03. The Clerk of Court is directed to file all pleadings in this case without requiring prepayment of fees or costs. Unless already done, the Clerk of Court is directed to comply with the procedures specified in In re: Administrative Orders of the Chief Judge, Case No. 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. 43 at 1-2 (Dec. 7, 2021), for ensuring that the United States Attorney's Office for the Middle District of Florida is notified of this action through the designated Assistant United States Attorney. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/12/2022. (WJF)
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/12/2022. (jmc)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases, 3:21-mc-1-TJC, Doc. #43. (jmc)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Nadine Elder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Elder, Nadine)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0227-JES-MRM. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (SJB)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Rodney Wade Severance. (Avard, Carol)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Rodney Wade Severance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Avard, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Severance v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Wade Severance
Represented By: Carol Ann Avard
Represented By: Mark V. Zakhvatayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?