Old Republic National Title Insurance Company v. Charles P. Rettig, Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Plaintiff: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, as Subrogee and Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Defendant: Charles P. Rettig, Commissioner of Internal Revenue and Charles P. Rettig
Case Number: 2:2022cv00262
Filed: April 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7426 IRS: Wrongful Levy for Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. Charles P. Rettig served on 5/10/2022. (Chesanek, Drew) Modified on 5/12/2022, to edit docket text. (SPB).
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corp. for Old Republic National Title Insurance Company. (Chesanek, Drew)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Charles P. Rettig. (SPB)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/26/2022. (SPB)
April 26, 2022 REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number AFLMDC-19495923 refunded in the amount of $ $402.00 paid to Adams and Reese LLP. (NLC)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:22-cv-0262-SPC-NPM. (SJB)
April 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charles P. Rettig, Commissioner of Internal Revenue (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19496016) filed by Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, as Subrogee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chesanek, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company v. Charles P. Rettig, Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, as Subrogee
Represented By: Drew F. Chesanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Drew F. Chesanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles P. Rettig, Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles P. Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?