Lange v. Lee County Sheriff
Plaintiff: Mark Patrick Lange
Defendant: Lee County Sheriff
Case Number: 2:2022cv00323
Filed: May 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John L Badalamenti
Referring Judge: Kyle C Dudek
2 Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to pay any applicable filing and administrative fees within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 7/7/2022. (Dudek, Kyle)
July 1, 2022 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kyle C Dudek. New case number: 2:22-cv-323-JLB-KCD. Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C Dudek. (LMF)
May 23, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/23/2022. (jmc)
May 19, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mark Patrick Lange. (jmc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
May 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lee County Sheriff with Jury Demand filed by Mark Patrick Lange. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lange v. Lee County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Patrick Lange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?