Upson Family Trust vs. M/V Job Site III
Plaintiff: UPSON FAMILY TRUST
Defendant: M/V JOB SITE III, a 2005 Sea Ray 550 Sedan, HIN: SERY1275D505, her engines, tackle, apparel, furniture, and equipment appertaining and belonging in rem, & DEVERE DENNINGS and CAROLE DENNINGS, in perso, M/V Job Site III, Devere Dennings and Carole Dennings
Case Number: 2:2022cv00336
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kyle C Dudek
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
2 Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 4 E before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. Parties shall file a Case Management Report on or before 8/29/2022. (WRW)
July 19, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #11 Amended Complaint, by Carole Dennings, Devere Dennings, M/V Job Site III.(Davant, Charles)
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kyle C Dudek. New case number: 2:22-cv-336-JES-KCD. Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy no longer assigned to the case. (LMF)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Order Directing the Issuance of a Warrant of Arrest. Pursuant to Supplemental Rule C and M.D. Fla. Admiralty and Maritime Practice Manual 3(a)(1)(A), the Clerk of Court is directed to issue a warrant of arrest in the above-styled action in the form attached as an exhibit to this Order. Furthermore, the Clerk of Court is directed to supply the United States Marshals Service with certified copies of all documents required by the United States Marshals Service to effectuate the arrest of Defendant Vessel. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest In Rem) (WJF)
June 13, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jules Victor Massee on behalf of Upson Family Trust. Lead Counsel: Jules V. Massee. (Massee, Jules)
June 10, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) against Carole Dennings, Devere Dennings, M/V Job Site III filed by Upson Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - All Known Salvors of Job Site III and its Tenders, #2 Exhibit 2 - Assignment of Salvage Rights to Upson Family Trust)(Lomelo, Dante)
June 9, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Devere Dennings. (SPB)
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Carole Dennings. (SPB)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER regarding #1 Verified Complaint. While the Verified Complaint states that "Plaintiff... has the sole rights to enforce maritime liens for salvage," (see Doc. #1 at 3), the Verified Complaint fails to allege the exact amount of damages and salvage sought. See M.D. Fla. Admiralty and Maritime Practice Manual 5(a) ("Every complaint in a Supplemental Rule B or C action must state the amount of the debt, damages, or salvage. The complaint must also specify the amount of any unliquidated claims, including attorney's fees."). Thus, no later than 6/10/2022, Plaintiff must filed an Amended Verified Complaint that fully complies with this Court's Admiralty and Maritime Practice Manual. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/7/2022. (WJF)
June 6, 2022 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Upson Family Trust. (Lomelo, Dante)
June 6, 2022 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Upson Family Trust. (Lomelo, Dante)
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/1/2022. (SPB)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0336-JES-MRM. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically FOR ORDER DIRECTING THE ISSUANCE OF A WARRANT OF ARREST . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (SJB)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically For Order Directing the Issuance of a Warrant of Arrest by Upson Family Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Directing Issuance of Arrest, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Warrant for Arrest in Rem) (Lomelo, Dante) Modified on 6/1/2022, to edit docket text and filer names. (SPB).
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 (VERIFIED) COMPLAINT against M/V Job Site III, Devere Dennings, Carole Dennings (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19619574) filed by Upson Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lomelo, Dante) Modified on 6/1/2022, to edit docket text and filers. (SPB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upson Family Trust vs. M/V Job Site III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPSON FAMILY TRUST
Represented By: Dante S. Lomelo
Represented By: Jules Victor Massee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V JOB SITE III, a 2005 Sea Ray 550 Sedan, HIN: SERY1275D505, her engines, tackle, apparel, furniture, and equipment appertaining and belonging in rem, & DEVERE DENNINGS and CAROLE DENNINGS, in perso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Job Site III
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devere Dennings
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carole Dennings
Represented By: Charles Stuart Davant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?