Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. vs. One 66' 2019 Sabre Dirigo
Plaintiff: Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc.
Defendant: MARINE TOWING & SALVAGE OF S.W. FL., INC., Plaintiff, v. ONE 66' 2019 SABRE DIRIGO, known as the M/V TERRY LEAH, (aka M/V WHIRLAWAY) its engines, tackle, equipment, apparel, appurtenances, e, Monte Briggs, EYRIE HOLDINGS, LLC, ONE 66' 2019 SABRE DIRIGO, known as the M/V TERRY LEAH, (aka M/V WHIRLAWAY), One 66' 2019 Sabre Dirigo and M
Case Number: 2:2022cv00346
Filed: June 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Kyle C Dudek
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 31301 Commercial Instruments and Maritime Liens
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim by Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. Related document: #12 Answer to amended complaint, Counterclaim filed by Eyrie Holdings, LLC.(May, Kelly Ann) Modified text on 7/21/2022 (SPM).
July 20, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2022 at 08:50 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 4 E before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. Parties shall file a Case Management Report on or before 8/10/2022. (WRW)
July 1, 2022 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kyle C Dudek. New case number: 2:22-cv-346-SPC-KCD. Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy no longer assigned to the case. (LMF)
June 30, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #11 Amended Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. by Eyrie Holdings, LLC.(Fertig, Christopher) Modified as to docket text on 6/30/2022 (JK).
June 29, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT (refiled solely to add Plaintiff verification) against Monte Briggs, Eyrie Holdings, LLC, One 66' 2019 Sabre Dirigo with Jury Demand. filed by Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint, filed by Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. (May, Kelly Ann) Modified on 6/30/2022 (SPB).
June 17, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Monte Briggs, Eyrie Holdings, LLC, One 66' 2019 Sabre Dirigo with Jury Demand. filed by Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract for Pure Salvage)(May, Kelly Ann)
June 14, 2022 Filing 9 PROOF of service, as to Eyrie Holdings, LLC served on 6/6/2022 by Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. (May, Kelly Ann) Modified on 6/15/2022, to correct docket text and service details. (SPB).
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. Related case(s): No (May, Kelly Ann)
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. (May, Kelly Ann)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kelly Ann LaVelle May on behalf of Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. Lead Counsel: Kelly Ann L. May. (May, Kelly Ann)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/3/2022. (SPB)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Eyrie Holdings, LLC. (SPB)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:22-cv-0346-SPC-MRM. (SJB)
June 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against One 66' 2019 Sabre Dirigo, Monte Briggs, Eyrie Holdings, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19631030) filed by Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(May, Kelly Ann) Modified on 6/3/2022, to edit docket text and filers. (SPB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc. vs. One 66' 2019 Sabre Dirigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Towing & Salvage of S.W. FL., Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Ann LaVelle May
Represented By: Frank D. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINE TOWING & SALVAGE OF S.W. FL., INC., Plaintiff, v. ONE 66' 2019 SABRE DIRIGO, known as the M/V TERRY LEAH, (aka M/V WHIRLAWAY) its engines, tackle, equipment, apparel, appurtenances, e
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monte Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EYRIE HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Darlene Mondi Lidondici
Represented By: Christopher R. Fertig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 66' 2019 SABRE DIRIGO, known as the M/V TERRY LEAH, (aka M/V WHIRLAWAY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 66' 2019 Sabre Dirigo
Represented By: Darlene Mondi Lidondici
Represented By: Christopher R. Fertig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M
Represented By: Darlene Mondi Lidondici
Represented By: Christopher R. Fertig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?