Securities & Exchange Commission v. Sirotka
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Defendant: Anthony Sirotka and United States Attorney's Office
Intervenor: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2022cv00348
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Filing 22 JOINT STATUS report by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Koonin, Russell) Modified text on 1/30/2023 (JK).
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 plaintiff's unopposed motion to withdraw counsel. The clerk is directed to remove attorney Robert K. Levenson as counsel of record for plaintiff and discontinue sending Levenson electronic notifications. Attorney Levenson shall have no further responsibility in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/14/2022. (JMM)
December 13, 2022 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Robert K. Levenson to Withdraw as Attorney by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Levenson, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
November 11, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of compliance re 18 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, by Anthony Sirotka (New, Jonathan) Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 11/14/2022 (JK).
November 7, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE to counsel Jonathan B. New of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (WRW)
October 31, 2022 Filing 17 STATUS report by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Koonin, Russell)
October 31, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell Koonin on behalf of Securities & Exchange Commission (Koonin, Russell)
August 8, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE canceling Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 10/6/2022 (WRW)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #10 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time because the case is stayed (Doc. #12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/8/2022. (SM)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 unopposed motion for special admission of Jonathan B. New. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/8/2022. (SM)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED: The Government's Unopposed Application to Intervene and for a Complete Stay (Doc. #8) is GRANTED. This action is STAYED until the conclusion of all proceedings in United States v. Sirotka, S1 Cr. 454 (S.D.N.Y.). The Clerk is DIRECTED to add a stay flag on the docket. The parties must FILE a status report on or before October 31, 2022, and every ninety (90) days after. The parties must immediately notify the Court when the criminal proceedings conclude. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/1/2022. (AEH)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2022 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 9/6/2022. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 22348. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW)
July 29, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Anthony Sirotka. (Asher, Geraldine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
July 29, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Jonathan B. New to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19829443 for $150 by Anthony Sirotka. (Asher, Geraldine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
July 29, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene and for a Complete Stay by United States of America. (Tekeei, Negar) Modified on 8/2/2022, to edit party names and docket text. (SPB).
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 06/15/2022 by Securities & Exchange Commission as to Anthony Sirotka. (Levenson, Robert)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Anthony Sirotka. (jmc)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (jmc)
June 3, 2022 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/3/2022. (jmc)
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Levenson, Robert)
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:22-cv-0348-SPC-NPM. (SJB)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT And Demand For Jury Trial against Anthony Sirotka with Jury Demand filed by Securities & Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Levenson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities & Exchange Commission v. Sirotka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: Robert K. Levenson
Represented By: Russell Koonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Sirotka
Represented By: Geraldine Patrizia Asher
Represented By: Jonathan B New
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney's Office
Represented By: Negar Tekeei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel Loss
Represented By: James McMahon
Represented By: Negar Tekeei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?